Texas 2013 83rd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1359 Introduced / Fiscal Note

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD    Austin, Texas      FISCAL NOTE, 83RD LEGISLATIVE REGULAR SESSION            April 29, 2013      TO: Honorable John Carona, Chair, Senate Committee on Business & Commerce      FROM: Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board     IN RE:SB1359 by Rodríguez (Relating to a prohibition of foods containing trans fat.), As Introduced    No significant fiscal implication to the State is anticipated.  The bill would add a new section to Chapter 437 of the Health and Safety Code, related to a prohibition of foods containing trans fat. The bill would require certain food service establishments to maintain labels of any food or food additive that contains any type of trans fat and to make the labels available during health inspections by the Department of State Health Services (DSHS) or local authorities. These provisions of the bill would take effect September 1, 2013.  In addition, food service establishments would be prohibited from using trans fat in a food or to prepare a food unless certain conditions are met. Food service establishments meeting certain criteria would be exempt from this prohibition until August 31, 2015. Food service establishments that contract with a food manufacturer or distributor would be exempt until either the date the contract expires or August 31, 2015, whichever date is later. This section related to the prohibition of using food with trans fat would take effect September 1, 2014.  It is expected that costs associated with implementing the bill, including increased time conducting health inspections, would not be significant and would be absorbed by DSHS. The agency has estimated that the bill would generate additional General Revenue, but it is assumed to be insignificant.  Local Government Impact No significant fiscal implication to units of local government is anticipated.    Source Agencies:360 State Office of Administrative Hearings, 537 State Health Services, Department of   LBB Staff:  UP, RB, JTe, NB    

LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD
Austin, Texas
FISCAL NOTE, 83RD LEGISLATIVE REGULAR SESSION
April 29, 2013





  TO: Honorable John Carona, Chair, Senate Committee on Business & Commerce      FROM: Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board     IN RE:SB1359 by Rodríguez (Relating to a prohibition of foods containing trans fat.), As Introduced  

TO: Honorable John Carona, Chair, Senate Committee on Business & Commerce
FROM: Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board
IN RE: SB1359 by Rodríguez (Relating to a prohibition of foods containing trans fat.), As Introduced

 Honorable John Carona, Chair, Senate Committee on Business & Commerce 

 Honorable John Carona, Chair, Senate Committee on Business & Commerce 

 Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board

 Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board

SB1359 by Rodríguez (Relating to a prohibition of foods containing trans fat.), As Introduced

SB1359 by Rodríguez (Relating to a prohibition of foods containing trans fat.), As Introduced



No significant fiscal implication to the State is anticipated.

No significant fiscal implication to the State is anticipated.



The bill would add a new section to Chapter 437 of the Health and Safety Code, related to a prohibition of foods containing trans fat. The bill would require certain food service establishments to maintain labels of any food or food additive that contains any type of trans fat and to make the labels available during health inspections by the Department of State Health Services (DSHS) or local authorities. These provisions of the bill would take effect September 1, 2013.  In addition, food service establishments would be prohibited from using trans fat in a food or to prepare a food unless certain conditions are met. Food service establishments meeting certain criteria would be exempt from this prohibition until August 31, 2015. Food service establishments that contract with a food manufacturer or distributor would be exempt until either the date the contract expires or August 31, 2015, whichever date is later. This section related to the prohibition of using food with trans fat would take effect September 1, 2014.  It is expected that costs associated with implementing the bill, including increased time conducting health inspections, would not be significant and would be absorbed by DSHS. The agency has estimated that the bill would generate additional General Revenue, but it is assumed to be insignificant. 

The bill would add a new section to Chapter 437 of the Health and Safety Code, related to a prohibition of foods containing trans fat. The bill would require certain food service establishments to maintain labels of any food or food additive that contains any type of trans fat and to make the labels available during health inspections by the Department of State Health Services (DSHS) or local authorities. These provisions of the bill would take effect September 1, 2013. 

In addition, food service establishments would be prohibited from using trans fat in a food or to prepare a food unless certain conditions are met. Food service establishments meeting certain criteria would be exempt from this prohibition until August 31, 2015. Food service establishments that contract with a food manufacturer or distributor would be exempt until either the date the contract expires or August 31, 2015, whichever date is later. This section related to the prohibition of using food with trans fat would take effect September 1, 2014. 

It is expected that costs associated with implementing the bill, including increased time conducting health inspections, would not be significant and would be absorbed by DSHS. The agency has estimated that the bill would generate additional General Revenue, but it is assumed to be insignificant. 

Local Government Impact

No significant fiscal implication to units of local government is anticipated.

Source Agencies: 360 State Office of Administrative Hearings, 537 State Health Services, Department of

360 State Office of Administrative Hearings, 537 State Health Services, Department of

LBB Staff: UP, RB, JTe, NB

 UP, RB, JTe, NB