Texas 2013 83rd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1367 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Duncan S.B. No. 1367
 (In the Senate - Filed March 7, 2013; March 18, 2013, read
 first time and referred to Committee on State Affairs;
 April 4, 2013, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0; April 4, 2013,
 sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1367 By:  Duncan


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to abolishing the Texas Health Insurance Pool.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  DEFINITIONS. In this Act:
 (1)  "Board" means the board of directors of the pool.
 (2)  "Commissioner" means the commissioner of
 insurance.
 (3)  "Department" means the Texas Department of
 Insurance.
 (4)  "Health benefit exchange" has the meaning assigned
 by Section 1369.201, Insurance Code.
 (5)  "Pool" means the Texas Health Insurance Pool
 established under Chapter 1506, Insurance Code, as that chapter
 existed before its repeal by this Act.
 SECTION 2.  PLAN FOR DISSOLUTION. As soon as practicable
 after the effective date of this Act, the board shall:
 (1)  develop a plan for:
 (A)  dissolving the board and the pool after the
 pool's obligations to issue and continue health benefit coverage
 terminate under Sections 3 and 4 of this Act; and
 (B)  transferring to the commissioner and the
 department:
 (i)  any continuing obligations of the board
 and the pool;
 (ii)  any assets of the pool;
 (iii)  any rights of the board or the pool
 that accrued before the dissolution of the board or the pool or that
 accrue with respect to coverage issued by the pool before the pool's
 dissolution; and
 (iv)  any authority previously held by the
 board the continuation of which is necessary or appropriate; and
 (2)  submit the plan to the commissioner for the
 commissioner's approval.
 SECTION 3.  ACCEPTANCE OF ENROLLEES. The latest date on
 which the pool may issue health benefit coverage is the later of:
 (1)  December 31, 2013; or
 (2)  the earliest date on which health benefit coverage
 is reasonably available on a guaranteed issue basis to each class of
 individuals eligible for health benefit coverage through the pool
 immediately before the effective date of this Act, as determined by
 the commissioner.
 SECTION 4.  TERMINATION OF POOL COVERAGE. Health benefit
 coverage that is issued to an individual by the pool and that is
 otherwise in force terminates on the later of:
 (1)  January 1, 2014; or
 (2)  the earliest date on which the individual:
 (A)  is enrolled in comparable health benefit
 coverage; or
 (B)  could reasonably be expected to have obtained
 health benefit coverage on a guaranteed issue basis, as determined
 by the commissioner.
 SECTION 5.  EXERCISE OF POOL'S RECOVERY RIGHTS.  The
 department may exercise any authority to recover overpayments or
 other amounts the pool would have been authorized to recover or
 collect had the pool not been dissolved, including amounts
 recoverable under the pool's subrogation rights.
 SECTION 6.  TRANSFER OF CERTAIN FUNDS; ASSESSMENT AUTHORITY
 CONTINUED. (a)  Any fund in which money belonging to the pool is
 kept and any other assets of the pool shall be transferred to the
 department on dissolution of the pool. That money and any other
 money recovered or otherwise collected by the department under this
 Act on behalf of the pool shall be used by the department to satisfy
 obligations of the pool in accordance with this Act, Chapter 1506,
 Insurance Code, as that chapter existed before its repeal by this
 Act, and the dissolution plan.
 (b)  The authority of the board to make assessments under
 Subchapter F, Chapter 1506, Insurance Code, as that subchapter
 existed before its repeal by this Act, is continued and may be
 exercised by the commissioner until the commissioner determines
 that all financial obligations of the board and the pool have been
 satisfied.
 (c)  Money collected by the department under Subsections (a)
 and (b) of this section shall be deposited to an account in the
 Texas Treasury Safekeeping Trust Company to be used for the
 purposes described by this Act. The money deposited to the account
 may be used to pay fees for the Texas Treasury Safekeeping Trust
 Company account. The department may transfer money into the
 treasury local operating fund to disburse the money as required by
 this Act.
 (d)  When the commissioner determines that all financial
 obligations of the board and the pool have been satisfied, the
 commissioner shall make a final accounting with respect to pool
 finances and:
 (1)  make any necessary final assessment under this
 section; or
 (2)  refund any surplus assessments or other surplus
 money collected on behalf of the pool, other than money described by
 Subsection (e) of this section:
 (A)  on a pro rata basis to the health benefit plan
 issuers that paid the assessments to the extent possible; or
 (B)  on another equitable basis to the extent pro
 rata refunds are not possible.
 (e)  If money paid or payable under Subsection (m), Section
 843.342 and Subsection (l), Section 1301.137, Insurance Code, is no
 longer necessary to finance premium discounts as prescribed by
 Section 1506.260, Insurance Code, as that section existed
 immediately before the effective date of this Act, and no other use
 is prescribed for that money by another Act of the legislature, the
 money shall be directed, at the commissioner's discretion, to the
 fund established under Subchapter F, Chapter 1508, Insurance Code,
 for a purpose provided by that subchapter or to the corporation
 established under Chapter 182, Health and Safety Code, for a
 purpose provided by that chapter.
 SECTION 7.  DELAYED IMPLEMENTATION. The commissioner by
 rule may delay the implementation of any part of Sections 1 through
 6 of this Act or the pool dissolution plan established under this
 Act if:
 (1)  the guaranteed issue of health benefit coverage is
 delayed;
 (2)  the operation of a health benefit exchange in this
 state is delayed; or
 (3)  the commissioner determines that health benefit
 coverage expected to be available on a guaranteed issue basis to a
 class of individuals eligible for coverage under Chapter 1506,
 Insurance Code, immediately before the effective date of this Act,
 is not reasonably available to those individuals in this state.
 SECTION 8.  REPEALER. (a)  Effective January 1, 2014, the
 following laws are repealed:
 (1)  Subsections (a-1) and (a-2), Section 1506.007,
 Insurance Code;
 (2)  Subsections (b) and (c), Section 1506.205,
 Insurance Code;
 (3)  Subsection (b), Section 1251.255, Insurance Code;
 and
 (4)  Section 1271.305, Insurance Code.
 (b)  Effective September 1, 2015, Chapter 1506, Insurance
 Code, is repealed.
 SECTION 9.  EFFECTIVE DATE. This Act takes effect
 immediately if it receives a vote of two-thirds of all the members
 elected to each house, as provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas
 Constitution. If this Act does not receive the vote necessary for
 immediate effect, this Act takes effect September 1, 2013.
 * * * * *