Texas 2013 83rd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1373 Enrolled / Bill

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    S.B. No. 1373


 AN ACT
 relating to display of the Honor and Remember flag.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter A, Chapter 2165, Government Code, is
 amended by adding Section 2165.0065 to read as follows:
 Sec. 2165.0065.  DISPLAY OF HONOR AND REMEMBER FLAG.
 (a)  In this section, "Honor and Remember flag" means the Honor and
 Remember, Inc., flag.
 (b)  The Honor and Remember flag may be displayed at each
 state office building, at the State Cemetery under Section
 2165.256, and at each veterans cemetery managed by the Veterans'
 Land Board on:
 (1)  the third Saturday in May, "Armed Forces Day";
 (2)  the last Monday in May, "Memorial Day";
 (3)  the last Sunday in September, "Gold Star Mother's
 Day";
 (4)  the 11th day of November, "Veterans Day"; and
 (5)  any date on which a resident of this state is
 killed while serving on active duty in the armed forces of the
 United States.
 SECTION 2.  The Honor and Remember flag is designated as the
 symbol of our state's concern and commitment to honoring and
 remembering the lives of all members of the United States armed
 forces who have lost their lives while serving or as a result of
 service and their families.
 SECTION 3.  The Honor and Remember flag's red field
 represents the blood shed by brave men and women who sacrificed
 their lives for freedom, and the flag's white border recognizes the
 purity of that sacrifice.  The flag's blue star is a symbol of
 active service in military conflict that dates back to World War I.
 The flag's gold star signifies the ultimate sacrifice of a warrior
 in active service who is not returning home and reflects the value
 of the life given.  The folded flag element highlights this nation's
 final tribute to a fallen service member and a family's sacrifice.
 The flag's flame symbolizes the eternal spirit of the departed.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2013.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1373 passed the Senate on
 April 11, 2013, by the following vote:  Yeas 31, Nays 0;
 May 24, 2013, Senate refused to concur in House amendments and
 requested appointment of Conference Committee; May 25, 2013, House
 granted request of the Senate; May 26, 2013, Senate adopted
 Conference Committee Report by the following vote:  Yeas 31,
 Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1373 passed the House, with
 amendments, on May 22, 2013, by the following vote:  Yeas 145,
 Nays 3, two present not voting; May 25, 2013, House granted request
 of the Senate for appointment of Conference Committee;
 May 26, 2013, House adopted Conference Committee Report by the
 following vote:  Yeas 145, Nays 2, two present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor