Texas 2013 83rd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1408 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Patrick S.B. No. 1408
 (In the Senate - Filed March 7, 2013; March 18, 2013, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Education; April 9, 2013,
 reported adversely, with favorable Committee Substitute by the
 following vote:  Yeas 7, Nays 2; April 9, 2013, sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1408 By:  Patrick


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to public school performance ratings that reflect
 acceptable and unacceptable performance.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 39.054, Education Code, is amended by
 amending Subsection (a) and adding Subsection (a-1) to read as
 follows:
 (a)  The commissioner shall adopt rules to evaluate school
 district and campus performance and, not later than August 8 of each
 year, assign each district and campus a performance rating of A, B,
 C, D, or F.  In adopting rules under this subsection, the
 commissioner shall determine the criteria for each designated
 letter performance rating and designate whether the letter
 performance rating [that] reflects acceptable performance or
 unacceptable performance.  If a district or campus earned
 [received] a performance rating of D or F [unacceptable
 performance] for the preceding school year, the commissioner shall
 notify the district of a subsequent such designation on or before
 June 15.
 (a-1)  In adopting rules for a district or campus performance
 rating under Subsection (a), the commissioner shall assign a letter
 performance rating:
 (1)  in a manner that gives greater weight to the
 performance of a district or campus regarding the required
 improvement rate determined by the commissioner under Section
 39.053(e) for the student achievement indicators adopted under
 Section 39.053(c); and
 (2)  based on:
 (A)  the measure of annual improvement in student
 achievement determined by the commissioner under Section 39.034;
 and
 (B)  other factors, as determined by the
 commissioner, for determining sufficient student attainment of
 postsecondary readiness.
 SECTION 2.  This Act applies beginning with the 2013-2014
 school year.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2013.
 * * * * *