By: Patrick, Paxton S.B. No. 1409 (In the Senate - Filed March 7, 2013; March 18, 2013, read first time and referred to Committee on Open Government; April 11, 2013, reported adversely, with favorable Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 4, Nays 1; April 11, 2013, sent to printer.) COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1409 By: Seliger A BILL TO BE ENTITLED AN ACT relating to public information regarding facilities of school districts and open-enrollment charter schools. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: SECTION 1. Chapter 46, Education Code, is amended by adding Subchapter D to read as follows: SUBCHAPTER D. PUBLIC INFORMATION REGARDING FACILITIES Sec. 46.101. AVAILABILITY OF INFORMATION REGARDING FACILITIES. (a) For the purpose of providing information to the public regarding district or school facilities usage and taxpayer value, a school district or open-enrollment charter school shall: (1) report data elements specified by commissioner rule to the agency through the Texas Student Data System (TSDS) or a successor data management system maintained by the agency; and (2) provide a direct link on the district's or school's Internet website to the Texas Student Data System (TSDS) or a successor data management system maintained by the agency through which the facilities information relevant to the specific district or school may be readily accessed. (b) The commissioner shall adopt rules necessary to implement this section, including rules ensuring that the Texas Student Data System (TSDS) or a successor data management system maintained by the agency includes appropriate data elements regarding school facilities usage and taxpayer value. (c) The commissioner shall adopt rules for purposes of Subsection (b) based on the recommendations of the Taxpayer Value and School Facilities Usage Advisory Committee established under Section 46.102. This subsection expires September 1, 2017. Sec. 46.102. TAXPAYER VALUE AND SCHOOL FACILITIES USAGE ADVISORY COMMITTEE. (a) The Taxpayer Value and School Facilities Usage Advisory Committee is established to serve the function specified by this section. (b) The committee consists of: (1) the commissioner and the comptroller, who serve as co-chairs of the committee; and (2) the following persons, appointed jointly by the commissioner and comptroller: (A) a current school board member; (B) a current school district administrator; (C) a current public school teacher; (D) a parent of a student currently enrolled in a public school; (E) a representative of the school construction industry, who may be an engineer, architect, or contractor; (F) a representative of the construction industry who does not work on school construction, who may be an engineer, architect, or contractor; and (G) a member of the public. (c) The commissioner and comptroller shall make the appointments required by Subsection (b) not later than October 15, 2013. (d) The committee shall meet to develop recommendations regarding the data that should be considered in evaluating a school district's or open-enrollment charter school's facility usage and taxpayer value with regard to school facility construction and renovation. The committee shall hold its initial meeting as soon as possible after the committee members are selected, but not later than November 15, 2013. (e) Not later than December 31, 2014, the committee shall develop its final recommendations and submit a report to the governor, lieutenant governor, and speaker of the house of representatives. The committee shall also make the report available electronically to members of the legislature. (f) Based on the recommendations developed by the committee, the commissioner shall: (1) ensure that the Texas Student Data System (TSDS) or a successor data management system maintained by the agency includes appropriate data elements regarding school facilities; and (2) adopt rules for purposes of Section 46.101. (g) A committee member is not entitled to reimbursement of expenses or to compensation. (h) Chapter 2110, Government Code, does not apply to the committee. (i) This section expires September 1, 2017. SECTION 2. Section 46.101, Education Code, as added by this Act, applies to a school district or open-enrollment charter school beginning on the effective date of rules adopted by the commissioner of education under Subsection (b), Section 46.101, Education Code, as added by this Act. SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2013. * * * * *