By: Huffman S.B. No. 141 (In the Senate - Filed December 11, 2012; January 29, 2013, read first time and referred to Committee on Health and Human Services; February 18, 2013, reported adversely, with favorable Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 8, Nays 0; February 18, 2013, sent to printer.) COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 141 By: Huffman A BILL TO BE ENTITLED AN ACT relating to the requirements for issuance of a license to practice orthotics and prosthetics. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: SECTION 1. Subsections (b) and (c), Section 605.252, Occupations Code, are amended to read as follows: (b) The requirements for a license established by board rule must include the requirement that the applicant hold: (1) a bachelor's or graduate degree in orthotics and prosthetics from: (A) an education program recognized and accredited by the Commission on Accreditation of Allied Health Education Programs that is offered at an institution of higher education; or (B) a practitioner education program that has education standards that are equivalent to or exceed the standards adopted by the Commission on Accreditation of Allied Health Education Programs; or (2) a bachelor's degree in another subject and an orthotic or prosthetic certificate issued by a practitioner education program: (A) recognized and accredited by the Commission on Accreditation of Allied Health Education Programs; or (B) that has education standards that are equivalent to or exceed the standards adopted by the Commission on Accreditation of Allied Health Education Programs. (c) To meet the clinical residency requirements for a license, the applicant must complete a [at least 1,900 hours of] professional clinical residency that meets the requirements established by board rule and is conducted under the direct supervision of a licensed orthotist, licensed prosthetist, or a licensed prosthetist orthotist in the discipline for which licensure is sought. The clinical residency requirements adopted by the board must be equivalent to or exceed the standards set by the National Commission on Orthotic and Prosthetic Education. SECTION 2. Subsection (a), Section 605.258, Occupations Code, is amended to read as follows: (a) The board may issue a student registration certificate to an individual who is working toward fulfilling the requirements for a license as an orthotist, prosthetist, or prosthetist orthotist and: (1) holds either: (A) [(1)] a bachelor's or graduate degree in orthotics and prosthetics from: (i) [(A)] an education program recognized and accredited by the Commission on Accreditation of Allied Health Education Programs that is offered at an institution of higher education; or (ii) [(B)] a practitioner education program that has education standards that are equivalent to or exceed the standards adopted by the Commission on Accreditation of Allied Health Education Programs; or (B) [(2)] a bachelor's degree in another subject and an orthotic or prosthetic certificate issued by a practitioner education program: (i) [(A)] recognized and accredited by the Commission on Accreditation of Allied Health Education Programs; or (ii) [(B)] that has education standards that are equivalent to or exceed the standards adopted by the Commission on Accreditation of Allied Health Education Programs; or (2) is a student who: (A) is currently enrolled in a graduate program in this state in orthotics and prosthetics that: (i) is recognized and accredited by the Commission on Accreditation of Allied Health Education Programs; and (ii) incorporates a professional clinical residency that meets the requirements of rules adopted under Section 605.252(c); and (B) submits to the board a written certification from the graduate program in which the student is enrolled that the student has successfully completed the academic prerequisites to enter a professional clinical residency. SECTION 3. The changes in law made by this Act to Chapter 605, Occupations Code, apply only to an application for a license or student registration certificate submitted to the Texas Board of Orthotics and Prosthetics on or after January 1, 2014. An application submitted before January 1, 2014, is governed by the law in effect immediately before the effective date of this Act, and the former law is continued in effect for that purpose. SECTION 4. The Texas Board of Orthotics and Prosthetics shall adopt rules to implement the changes in law made by this Act not later than December 1, 2013. SECTION 5. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this Act takes effect September 1, 2013. * * * * *