Texas 2013 83rd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB141 Enrolled / Bill

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    S.B. No. 141


 AN ACT
 relating to the requirements for issuance of a license to practice
 orthotics and prosthetics.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subsections (b) and (c), Section 605.252,
 Occupations Code, are amended to read as follows:
 (b)  The requirements for a license established by board rule
 must include the requirement that the applicant hold:
 (1)  a bachelor's or graduate degree in orthotics and
 prosthetics from:
 (A)  an education program recognized and
 accredited by the Commission on Accreditation of Allied Health
 Education Programs that is offered at an institution of higher
 education; or
 (B)  a practitioner education program that has
 education standards that are equivalent to or exceed the standards
 adopted by the Commission on Accreditation of Allied Health
 Education Programs; or
 (2)  a bachelor's degree in another subject and an
 orthotic or prosthetic certificate issued by a practitioner
 education program:
 (A)  recognized and accredited by the Commission
 on Accreditation of Allied Health Education Programs; or
 (B)  that has education standards that are
 equivalent to or exceed the standards adopted by the Commission on
 Accreditation of Allied Health Education Programs.
 (c)  To meet the clinical residency requirements for a
 license, the applicant must complete a [at least 1,900 hours of]
 professional clinical residency that meets the requirements
 established by board rule and is conducted under the direct
 supervision of a licensed orthotist, licensed prosthetist, or a
 licensed prosthetist orthotist in the discipline for which
 licensure is sought.  The clinical residency requirements adopted
 by the board must be equivalent to or exceed the standards set by
 the National Commission on Orthotic and Prosthetic Education.
 SECTION 2.  Subsection (a), Section 605.258, Occupations
 Code, is amended to read as follows:
 (a)  The board may issue a student registration certificate
 to an individual who is working toward fulfilling the requirements
 for a license as an orthotist, prosthetist, or prosthetist
 orthotist and:
 (1)  holds either:
 (A)  [(1)]  a bachelor's or graduate degree in
 orthotics and prosthetics from:
 (i)  [(A)]  an education program recognized
 and accredited by the Commission on Accreditation of Allied Health
 Education Programs that is offered at an institution of higher
 education; or
 (ii)  [(B)]  a practitioner education
 program that has education standards that are equivalent to or
 exceed the standards adopted by the Commission on Accreditation of
 Allied Health Education Programs; or
 (B)  [(2)]  a bachelor's degree in another
 subject and an orthotic or prosthetic certificate issued by a
 practitioner education program:
 (i)  [(A)]  recognized and accredited by the
 Commission on Accreditation of Allied Health Education Programs; or
 (ii)  [(B)]  that has education standards
 that are equivalent to or exceed the standards adopted by the
 Commission on Accreditation of Allied Health Education Programs; or
 (2)  is a student who:
 (A)  is currently enrolled in a graduate program
 in this state in orthotics and prosthetics that:
 (i)  is recognized and accredited by the
 Commission on Accreditation of Allied Health Education Programs;
 and
 (ii)  incorporates a professional clinical
 residency that meets the requirements of rules adopted under
 Section 605.252(c); and
 (B)  submits to the board a written certification
 from the graduate program in which the student is enrolled that the
 student has successfully completed the academic prerequisites to
 enter a professional clinical residency.
 SECTION 3.  The changes in law made by this Act to Chapter
 605, Occupations Code, apply only to an application for a license or
 student registration certificate submitted to the Texas Board of
 Orthotics and Prosthetics on or after January 1, 2014.  An
 application submitted before January 1, 2014, is governed by the
 law in effect immediately before the effective date of this Act, and
 the former law is continued in effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 4.  The Texas Board of Orthotics and Prosthetics
 shall adopt rules to implement the changes in law made by this Act
 not later than December 1, 2013.
 SECTION 5.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2013.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 141 passed the Senate on
 March 13, 2013, by the following vote:  Yeas 31, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 141 passed the House on
 May 22, 2013, by the following vote:  Yeas 147, Nays 0, one
 present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor