Texas 2013 83rd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1415 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Deuell S.B. No. 1415
 (In the Senate - Filed March 7, 2013; March 18, 2013, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Transportation;
 April 11, 2013, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 7,
 Nays 0; April 11, 2013, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to notice of termination by suppliers of certain dealer
 agreements governed by the Fair Practices of Equipment
 Manufacturers, Distributors, Wholesalers, and Dealers Act.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subsection (c), Section 57.155, Business &
 Commerce Code, as added by Chapter 1039 (H.B. 3079), Acts of the
 82nd Legislature, Regular Session, 2011, is amended to read as
 follows:
 (c)  The notice and right to cure provisions in this section
 do not apply if the reason for termination is for any reason stated
 in Sections 57.154(a)(2)-(11) [57.154(a)(1)-(11)].
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2013.
 * * * * *