By: Hinojosa S.B. No. 1423 (Hunter) A BILL TO BE ENTITLED AN ACT relating to validating certain acts of the Lower Nueces River Water Supply District transferring real property rights. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: SECTION 1. On or before August 1, 1986, in accordance with Chapter 844, Acts of the 69th Legislature, Regular Session, 1985, the board of directors of the Lower Nueces River Water Supply District paid or provided for the payment of all debts and liabilities of the district and transferred all district assets to the City of Corpus Christi, including all district rights to real property. Additionally, the district's enabling legislation, Chapter 159, Acts of the 51st Legislature, Regular Session, 1949, was repealed, and the Lower Nueces River Water Supply District was dissolved in accordance with Chapter 844. SECTION 2. (a) The governmental acts and proceedings of the Lower Nueces River Water Supply District taken to comply with Chapter 844, Acts of the 69th Legislature, Regular Session, 1985, relating to the 1986 transfer to the City of Corpus Christi of district rights to real property included in the 1986 quitclaim deed recordings described by Section 3 of this Act are validated and confirmed as of the dates the transfers occurred. The acts and proceedings may not be held invalid because they were not performed in accordance with Chapter 51, Water Code, or other law. (b) The 1986 transfer of rights to real property included in the 1986 quitclaim deed recordings described by Section 3 of this Act by the Lower Nueces River Water Supply District to the City of Corpus Christi may not be held invalid on the ground that the transfer, in the absence of this Act, was invalid. (c) The City of Corpus Christi is the owner of the rights to real property transferred to the city in accordance with Chapter 844, Acts of the 69th Legislature, Regular Session, 1985, and included in the 1986 quitclaim deed recordings described by Section 3 of this Act. (d) This section does not apply to any matter that on the effective date of this Act: (1) is involved in litigation if the litigation ultimately results in the matter being held invalid by a final court judgment; or (2) has been held invalid by a final court judgment. SECTION 3. The property transfers made in 1986 as quitclaim deeds in accordance with Section 3, Chapter 844, Acts of the 69th Legislature, Regular Session, 1985, transferring property from the Lower Nueces River Water Supply District to the City of Corpus Christi have been filed as follows: (1) in Nueces County on September 26, 2011, as Document 2011034981 filed in the property records of Nueces County; (2) in Atascosa County on September 30, 2011, as recording number 125295 filed in the property records of Atascosa County; (3) in Jim Wells County on September 27, 2011, as recording number 413632 filed in the property records of Jim Wells County; (4) in Live Oak County on September 27, 2011, as recording number 195798 filed in the property records of Live Oak County; and (5) in San Patricio County on September 27, 2011, as recording number 611795 filed in the property records of San Patricio County. SECTION 4. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this Act takes effect September 1, 2013.