Texas 2013 83rd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1423 Comm Sub / Bill

                    By: Hinojosa S.B. No. 1423
 (Hunter)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to validating certain acts of the Lower Nueces River Water
 Supply District transferring real property rights.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  On or before August 1, 1986, in accordance with
 Chapter 844, Acts of the 69th Legislature, Regular Session, 1985,
 the board of directors of the Lower Nueces River Water Supply
 District paid or provided for the payment of all debts and
 liabilities of the district and transferred all district assets to
 the City of Corpus Christi, including all district rights to real
 property. Additionally, the district's enabling legislation,
 Chapter 159, Acts of the 51st Legislature, Regular Session, 1949,
 was repealed, and the Lower Nueces River Water Supply District was
 dissolved in accordance with Chapter 844.
 SECTION 2.  (a)  The governmental acts and proceedings of
 the Lower Nueces River Water Supply District taken to comply with
 Chapter 844, Acts of the 69th Legislature, Regular Session, 1985,
 relating to the 1986 transfer to the City of Corpus Christi of
 district rights to real property included in the 1986 quitclaim
 deed recordings described by Section 3 of this Act are validated and
 confirmed as of the dates the transfers occurred. The acts and
 proceedings may not be held invalid because they were not performed
 in accordance with Chapter 51, Water Code, or other law.
 (b)  The 1986 transfer of rights to real property included in
 the 1986 quitclaim deed recordings described by Section 3 of this
 Act by the Lower Nueces River Water Supply District to the City of
 Corpus Christi may not be held invalid on the ground that the
 transfer, in the absence of this Act, was invalid.
 (c)  The City of Corpus Christi is the owner of the rights to
 real property transferred to the city in accordance with Chapter
 844, Acts of the 69th Legislature, Regular Session, 1985, and
 included in the 1986 quitclaim deed recordings described by Section
 3 of this Act.
 (d)  This section does not apply to any matter that on the
 effective date of this Act:
 (1)  is involved in litigation if the litigation
 ultimately results in the matter being held invalid by a final court
 judgment; or
 (2)  has been held invalid by a final court judgment.
 SECTION 3.  The property transfers made in 1986 as quitclaim
 deeds in accordance with Section 3, Chapter 844, Acts of the 69th
 Legislature, Regular Session, 1985, transferring property from the
 Lower Nueces River Water Supply District to the City of Corpus
 Christi have been filed as follows:
 (1)  in Nueces County on September 26, 2011, as
 Document 2011034981 filed in the property records of Nueces County;
 (2)  in Atascosa County on September 30, 2011, as
 recording number 125295 filed in the property records of Atascosa
 County;
 (3)  in Jim Wells County on September 27, 2011, as
 recording number 413632 filed in the property records of Jim Wells
 County;
 (4)  in Live Oak County on September 27, 2011, as
 recording number 195798 filed in the property records of Live Oak
 County; and
 (5)  in San Patricio County on September 27, 2011, as
 recording number 611795 filed in the property records of San
 Patricio County.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2013.