Texas 2013 83rd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1430 Enrolled / Bill

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    S.B. No. 1430


 AN ACT
 relating to the applicability of certain public works contracting
 requirements.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 2267.354, Government Code, as added by
 Chapter 1129 (H.B. 628), Acts of the 82nd Legislature, Regular
 Session, 2011, is amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 2267.354.  LIMITATION ON NUMBER OF PROJECTS. (a)
 [Before September 1, 2013:
 [(1)     a governmental entity with a population of
 500,000 or more within the entity's geographic boundary or service
 area may, under this subchapter, enter into contracts for not more
 than three projects in any fiscal year; and
 [(2)     a municipally owned water utility with a separate
 governing board appointed by the governing body of a municipality
 with a population of 500,000 or more may:
 [(A)     independently enter into a contract for not
 more than one civil works project in any fiscal year; and
 [(B)     enter into contracts for additional civil
 works projects in any fiscal year, but not more than the number of
 civil works projects prescribed by the limit in Subdivision (1) for
 the municipality, provided that:
 [(i)     the additional contracts for the civil
 works projects entered into by the utility under this paragraph are
 allocated to the number of contracts the municipality that appoints
 the utility's governing board may enter under Subdivision (1); and
 [(ii)     the governing body of the
 municipality must approve the contracts.
 [(b)     Before September 1, 2015, a governmental entity that
 has a population of 100,000 or more but less than 500,000 or is a
 board of trustees governed by Chapter 54, Transportation Code, may
 enter into contracts under this subchapter for not more than two
 projects in any fiscal year.
 [(c)]  After August 31, 2013 [the period described by
 Subsection (a) or (b)]:
 (1)  a governmental entity with a population of 500,000
 or more within the entity's geographic boundary or service area
 may, under this subchapter, enter into contracts for not more than
 six projects in any fiscal year;
 (2)  a municipally owned water utility with a separate
 governing board appointed by the governing body of a municipality
 with a population of 500,000 or more may:
 (A)  independently enter into contracts for not
 more than two civil works projects in any fiscal year; and
 (B)  enter into contracts for additional civil
 works projects in any fiscal year, but not more than the number of
 civil works projects prescribed by the limit in Subdivision (1) for
 the municipality, provided that:
 (i)  the additional contracts for the civil
 works projects entered into by the utility under this paragraph are
 allocated to the number of contracts the municipality that appoints
 the utility's governing board may enter under Subdivision (1); and
 (ii)  the governing body of the municipality
 must approve the contracts; and
 (3)  a governmental entity that has a population of
 100,000 or more but less than 500,000 or is a board of trustees
 governed by Chapter 54, Transportation Code, may enter into
 contracts under this subchapter for not more than four projects in
 any fiscal year.
 (b) [(d)]  For purposes of determining the number of
 eligible projects under this section, a municipally owned water
 utility with a separate governing board appointed by the governing
 body of the municipality is considered part of the municipality.
 SECTION 2.  Subsection (c-1), Section 252.048, Local
 Government Code, is amended to read as follows:
 (c-1)  If a change order for a public works contract in a
 municipality with a population of 300,000 [500,000] or more
 involves a decrease or an increase of $100,000 or less, or a lesser
 amount as provided by ordinance, the governing body of the
 municipality may grant general authority to an administrative
 official of the municipality to approve the change order.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2013.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1430 passed the Senate on
 April 11, 2013, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0; and that
 the Senate concurred in House amendment on May 24, 2013, by the
 following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1430 passed the House, with
 amendment, on May 20, 2013, by the following vote: Yeas 146,
 Nays 0, two present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor