Texas 2013 83rd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1484 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Watson, Davis, Lucio S.B. No. 1484
 (In the Senate - Filed March 7, 2013; March 18, 2013, read
 first time and referred to Committee on State Affairs;
 April 24, 2013, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 5, Nays 4; April 24, 2013,
 sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1484 By:  Lucio


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to health benefit plan coverage for enrollees diagnosed
 with autism spectrum disorder.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 1355.015, Insurance Code, is amended by
 amending Subsection (a) and adding Subsection (f) to read as
 follows:
 (a)  At a minimum, a health benefit plan must provide
 coverage as provided by this section to an enrollee who is diagnosed
 with autism spectrum disorder from the date of diagnosis [until the
 enrollee completes nine years of age.     If an enrollee who is being
 treated for autism spectrum disorder becomes 10 years of age or
 older and continues to need treatment, this subsection does not
 preclude coverage of treatment and services described by Subsection
 (b)].
 (f)  To the extent that this section would otherwise require
 this state to make a payment under 42 U.S.C. Section
 18031(d)(3)(B)(ii), a qualified health plan, as defined by 45
 C.F.R. Section 155.20, is not required to provide a benefit under
 this section that exceeds the specified essential health benefits
 required under 42 U.S.C. Section 18022(b).
 SECTION 2.  The heading to Section 1355.015, Insurance Code,
 is amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 1355.015.  REQUIRED COVERAGE FOR CERTAIN ENROLLEES
 [CHILDREN].
 SECTION 3.  (a)  Subsection (a), Section 1355.015,
 Insurance Code, as amended by this Act, applies only to a health
 benefit plan that is delivered, issued for delivery, or renewed on
 or after the effective date of this Act. A health benefit plan that
 is delivered, issued for delivery, or renewed before the effective
 date of this Act is covered by the law in effect at the time the
 health benefit plan is delivered, issued for delivery, or renewed,
 and that law is continued in effect for that purpose.
 (b)  Subsection (f), Section 1355.015, Insurance Code, as
 added by this Act, applies only to a health benefit plan that is
 delivered, issued for delivery, or renewed on or after January 1,
 2014. A health benefit plan that is delivered, issued for delivery,
 or renewed before January 1, 2014, is covered by the law in effect
 at the time the health benefit plan is delivered, issued for
 delivery, or renewed, and that law is continued in effect for that
 purpose.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2013.
 * * * * *