Texas 2013 83rd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1487 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Watson S.B. No. 1487
 (In the Senate - Filed March 7, 2013; March 18, 2013, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Transportation;
 April 4, 2013, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 8, Nays 0; April 4, 2013,
 sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1487 By:  Watson


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the abandonment of a county road.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subsection (b), Section 251.057, Transportation
 Code, is amended to read as follows:
 (b)  This section does not apply to:
 (1)  a road to a cemetery, unless a property owner who
 enclosed the road with a fence under Subsection (a) files notice
 with the county clerk of the county in which the road is located
 that the owner agrees to provide reasonable access to the cemetery
 in accordance with Section 711.041, Health and Safety Code; or
 (2)  an access road that is reasonably necessary to
 reach adjoining real property.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2013.
 * * * * *