Texas 2013 83rd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1488 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Watson S.B. No. 1488
 (In the Senate - Filed March 7, 2013; March 18, 2013, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Transportation;
 April 29, 2013, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 5, Nays 4; April 29, 2013,
 sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1488 By:  Watson


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to comprehensive development agreements for the
 financing, design, acquisition, construction, maintenance, or
 operation of certain passenger rail projects.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter Z, Chapter 131, Transportation Code,
 is amended by adding Section 131.905 to read as follows:
 Sec. 131.905.  COMPREHENSIVE DEVELOPMENT AGREEMENTS FOR
 CERTAIN RAIL PROJECTS. (a)  A comprehensive development agreement
 for the financing, design, acquisition, construction, maintenance,
 or operation of a passenger rail project that uses an existing rail
 corridor may be entered into:
 (1)  by:
 (A)  the department;
 (B)  a regional mobility authority governed by
 Chapter 370 that was created before January 1, 2003; or
 (C)  a rapid transit authority governed by Chapter
 451 that was confirmed before July 1, 1985, and in which the
 principal municipality has a population of less than 850,000; and
 (2)  for:
 (A)  the Elgin Rail project, as identified in the
 Capital Area Metropolitan Planning Organization long-range
 transportation plan for 2035; and
 (B)  projects associated with the portion of the
 MoKan corridor located in Travis County.
 (b)  Notwithstanding Sections 223.201(f) and (i), the
 provisions of Chapter 223 relating to comprehensive development
 agreements for a toll project entered into by the department apply
 to comprehensive development agreements for a rail project entered
 into by an entity under Subsection (a).
 (c)  Chapter 371 applies to a comprehensive development
 agreement under Subsection (a) as provided by Section 371.004.
 SECTION 2.  Subchapter A, Chapter 371, Transportation Code,
 is amended by adding Section 371.004 to read as follows:
 Sec. 371.004.  APPLICABILITY TO CERTAIN RAIL PROJECTS. For
 the purposes of applying this chapter to a comprehensive
 development agreement under Section 131.905:
 (1)  "toll project entity" includes an entity that
 enters into a comprehensive development agreement under that
 section;
 (2)  "toll project" includes a project under that
 section; and
 (3)  "toll" means passenger fares and other revenue
 derived from charges for use of the project.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2013.
 * * * * *