By: Watson S.B. No. 1488 (In the Senate - Filed March 7, 2013; March 18, 2013, read first time and referred to Committee on Transportation; April 29, 2013, reported adversely, with favorable Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 5, Nays 4; April 29, 2013, sent to printer.) COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1488 By: Watson A BILL TO BE ENTITLED AN ACT relating to comprehensive development agreements for the financing, design, acquisition, construction, maintenance, or operation of certain passenger rail projects. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: SECTION 1. Subchapter Z, Chapter 131, Transportation Code, is amended by adding Section 131.905 to read as follows: Sec. 131.905. COMPREHENSIVE DEVELOPMENT AGREEMENTS FOR CERTAIN RAIL PROJECTS. (a) A comprehensive development agreement for the financing, design, acquisition, construction, maintenance, or operation of a passenger rail project that uses an existing rail corridor may be entered into: (1) by: (A) the department; (B) a regional mobility authority governed by Chapter 370 that was created before January 1, 2003; or (C) a rapid transit authority governed by Chapter 451 that was confirmed before July 1, 1985, and in which the principal municipality has a population of less than 850,000; and (2) for: (A) the Elgin Rail project, as identified in the Capital Area Metropolitan Planning Organization long-range transportation plan for 2035; and (B) projects associated with the portion of the MoKan corridor located in Travis County. (b) Notwithstanding Sections 223.201(f) and (i), the provisions of Chapter 223 relating to comprehensive development agreements for a toll project entered into by the department apply to comprehensive development agreements for a rail project entered into by an entity under Subsection (a). (c) Chapter 371 applies to a comprehensive development agreement under Subsection (a) as provided by Section 371.004. SECTION 2. Subchapter A, Chapter 371, Transportation Code, is amended by adding Section 371.004 to read as follows: Sec. 371.004. APPLICABILITY TO CERTAIN RAIL PROJECTS. For the purposes of applying this chapter to a comprehensive development agreement under Section 131.905: (1) "toll project entity" includes an entity that enters into a comprehensive development agreement under that section; (2) "toll project" includes a project under that section; and (3) "toll" means passenger fares and other revenue derived from charges for use of the project. SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2013. * * * * *