Texas 2013 83rd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1531 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Seliger S.B. No. 1531
 (In the Senate - Filed March 8, 2013; March 19, 2013, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Higher Education;
 April 18, 2013, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 7, Nays 0; April 18, 2013,
 sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1531 By:  Seliger


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to providing information to entering undergraduate
 students at certain general academic teaching institutions to
 promote timely graduation.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter Z, Chapter 51, Education Code, is
 amended by adding Section 51.9195 to read as follows:
 Sec. 51.9195.  INFORMATION FOR UNDERGRADUATE STUDENTS
 REGARDING BENEFITS OF TIMELY GRADUATION. (a) In this section,
 "general academic teaching institution" and "public state college"
 have the meanings assigned by Section 61.003.
 (b)  This section applies only to a general academic teaching
 institution other than a public state college.
 (c)  An institution to which this section applies shall
 provide to each first-time entering undergraduate student,
 including each undergraduate student who transfers to the
 institution, information in electronic or paper format that
 includes, based on a reasonable projection by the institution using
 the most recently available data:
 (1)  a comparison of the average total amounts of
 tuition and fees paid by a full-time student who graduates from the
 institution in the following number of academic years:
 (A)  four years;
 (B)  five years; and
 (C)  six years; and
 (2)  an estimate of the average earnings lost by a
 recent graduate of the institution as a result of graduating after
 five or six years instead of four years.
 (d)  An institution to which this section applies shall
 include with the information provided to a student under Subsection
 (c):
 (1)  a list of actions that the student can take to
 facilitate graduating from the institution in a timely manner; and
 (2)  contact information for available academic,
 career, and other related support services at the institution to
 assist the student in that effort.
 (e)  An institution to which this section applies may satisfy
 the requirements of Subsections (c)(1) and (2) with regard to a
 student by providing the student with information that is more
 specific than the information described by those subdivisions.
 SECTION 2.  Section 51.9195, Education Code, as added by
 this Act, applies beginning with undergraduate students who
 initially enroll in a general academic teaching institution for the
 2014 fall semester.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2013.
 * * * * *