Texas 2013 83rd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1557 Comm Sub / Bill

                    By: Lucio, Seliger S.B. No. 1557
 (In the Senate - Filed March 8, 2013; March 19, 2013, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Education; April 18, 2013,
 reported adversely, with favorable Committee Substitute by the
 following vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0; April 18, 2013, sent to printer.)
 Van de PutteCOMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1557 By:  Lucio


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to business and nonprofit organization participation in
 supporting early college high schools.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 29.908, Education Code, is amended by
 amending Subsections (c) and (d) and adding Subsections (e), (f),
 and (g) to read as follows:
 (c)  A student participating in the program is entitled to
 the benefits of the Foundation School Program in proportion to the
 amount of time spent by the student on high school courses, in
 accordance with rules adopted by the commissioner, while completing
 the course of study established by the applicable articulation
 agreement under Subsection (b)(3).
 (d)  The commissioner may accept gifts, grants, and
 donations from any source, including private and nonprofit
 organizations.  Private and nonprofit organizations that
 contribute to the fund shall receive an award under Section 7.113[,
 to pay any costs of the program not covered by the student's
 Foundation School Program benefits].
 (e)  The commissioner shall collaborate with the Texas
 Workforce Commission and the Texas Higher Education Coordinating
 Board to develop and implement a strategic plan to enhance private
 industry participation under this section.  The plan must include:
 (1)  strategies to increase private industry
 participation; and
 (2)  incentives for businesses and nonprofit
 organizations that choose to make donations and work with high
 schools that participate in a program under this section to
 maximize job placement opportunities for program graduates.
 (f)  Not later than December 1, 2014, the commissioner shall
 provide a report that summarizes the strategic plan developed under
 Subsection (e) to the lieutenant governor, the speaker of the house
 of representatives, the governor, the Texas Workforce Commission,
 and the Texas Higher Education Coordinating Board.  The Texas
 Education Agency, the Texas Workforce Commission, and the Texas
 Higher Education Coordinating Board shall each make the report
 available on the respective agency's Internet website.
 (g) [(d)]  The commissioner may adopt rules as necessary to
 administer the program.  The rules may provide for giving
 preference in receiving program benefits to a student who is in the
 first generation of the student's family to attend college and may
 establish other distinctions or criteria based on student need.
 The commissioner shall consult the Texas Higher Education
 Coordinating Board in administering the program.  The Texas Higher
 Education Coordinating Board may adopt rules as necessary to
 exercise its powers and duties under this section.  The P-16 Council
 may make recommendations, including recommendations for rules,
 concerning administration of the program.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2013.
 * * * * *