Texas 2013 83rd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1560 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Taylor S.B. No. 1560
 (In the Senate - Filed March 8, 2013; March 19, 2013, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Natural Resources;
 May 2, 2013, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 7, Nays 0; May 2, 2013,
 sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1560 By:  Hegar


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to easements used for dune construction and maintenance
 projects.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter A, Chapter 63, Natural Resources
 Code, is amended by adding Section 63.004 to read as follows:
 Sec. 63.004.  DUNE PROJECT EASEMENT. (a)  For the purposes
 of this section, "dune project" means a state, county, or municipal
 project to construct and maintain a vegetated stabilized dune on a
 beach for protection against avulsive and meteorological events.
 (b)  A person who owns property that borders the line of mean
 high tide or mean higher high tide, as applicable, that establishes
 the boundary of state-owned submerged land may grant an easement on
 the property or a portion of the property to this state, a county,
 or a municipality for the purpose of allowing the governmental
 entity to construct and maintain a dune project in the easement.
 (c)  A person who grants a dune project easement under
 Subsection (b) must include with the easement a survey locating:
 (1)  the line of mean high tide or mean higher high
 tide, as applicable;
 (2)  the seaward and landward boundaries of the dune
 project; and
 (3)  each state, county, or municipal easement on the
 property that is the subject of the dune project easement that was
 recorded before the granting of the dune project easement.
 (d)  The granting of a dune project easement under Subsection
 (b) does not:
 (1)  create a burden on or right of access to the
 grantor's property that is not specifically provided for in the
 easement; or
 (2)  restrict the grantor's right to use the beach or
 the land subject to the easement, provided that the grantor's use of
 the beach or the land subject to the easement does not:
 (A)  unreasonably interfere with public
 recreational use of land subject to an easement for recreational
 use or construction or maintenance of a dune project in the dune
 project easement; or
 (B)  violate a state, county, or municipal law.
 (e)  The terms of a dune project easement granted under
 Subsection (b) may provide that the seaward boundary of the
 easement may be affected by gradual or avulsive changes in the line
 of mean high tide or mean higher high tide, as applicable.
 (f)  A dune project easement granted under Subsection (b)
 automatically terminates if the governmental entity granted the
 easement:
 (1)  does not commence construction of a dune project
 in the easement within a reasonable period of time or fails to
 maintain the dune project after completion of the project; or
 (2)  does not substantially repair or replace a
 completed dune project after the project is damaged or destroyed by
 an avulsive or meteorological event.
 (g)  A person may not grant a dune project easement under
 Subsection (b) unless the person dedicates a portion of the
 easement to the public for use as a recreational easement.  The
 recreational easement must border the boundary of the public beach.
 The recreational easement must authorize users of the easement to
 conduct recreational activities traditionally associated with
 enjoying gulf beaches on the easement that comply with state,
 county, and municipal laws, including fishing, boat launching,
 picnicking, hiking, running, studying nature, bird-watching,
 engaging in water sports, bicycling, and dog walking.
 (h)  A person who grants a recreational easement under
 Subsection (g) does not by granting the easement:
 (1)  assure the public that the premises are safe for
 recreational purposes;
 (2)  have a duty to the public to exercise a greater
 degree of care than the grantor would owe to a trespasser on the
 property; or
 (3)  assume responsibility or incur liability for an
 injury to a public user of the easement caused by an act of another
 public user of the easement.
 (i)  Subsection (h) does not limit the liability of a person
 who grants a recreational easement and has been grossly negligent
 or has acted with malicious intent or in bad faith.
 (j)  A recreational easement granted under Subsection (g)
 automatically terminates if the associated dune project easement
 terminates.
 (k)  A governmental entity that is granted an easement under
 this section shall execute a recordable release of the easement and
 deliver the release to the owner of the property on which the
 easement is located if the easement is terminated.  The
 governmental entity is not required to remove the dune project if
 the easement is terminated.
 SECTION 2.  The change in law made by this Act applies only
 to an easement granted on or after the effective date of this Act.
 An easement granted before the effective date of this Act is
 governed by the law in effect on the date the easement was granted,
 and the former law is continued in effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2013.
 * * * * *