Texas 2013 83rd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1576 Comm Sub / Bill

                    By: Zaffirini S.B. No. 1576
 (In the Senate - Filed March 8, 2013; March 19, 2013, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Health and Human Services;
 April 22, 2013, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 8, Nays 0; April 22, 2013,
 sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1576 By:  Zaffirini


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to a study and report of issues affecting persons with
 disabilities at state agencies and postsecondary educational
 institutions.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Chapter 115, Human Resources Code, is amended by
 adding Section 115.0095 to read as follows:
 Sec. 115.0095.  STUDY REGARDING ACCESSIBILITY OF STATE
 AGENCY AND HIGHER EDUCATION RESOURCES AND INFORMATION.  (a)  In
 this section, "postsecondary educational institution" means an
 institution of higher education or a private or independent
 institution of higher education, as those terms are defined by
 Section 61.003, Education Code.
 (b)  The committee, in collaboration with the Texas Higher
 Education Coordinating Board and the Department of Information
 Resources, shall conduct a study to identify difficulties persons
 with disabilities are encountering at state agencies and
 postsecondary educational institutions that receive state or
 federal funds.
 (c)  The study must include an evaluation of the
 accessibility of resources and information, whether printed or
 electronic, including:
 (1)  materials provided by a state agency or
 postsecondary educational institution; and
 (2)  with regard to a postsecondary educational
 institution, learning and content management software used by the
 institution and information and resources provided by student
 organizations of the institution.
 (d)  The committee shall include the results of the study and
 any recommendations for legislative or administrative action in the
 report submitted to the governor and the legislature under Section
 115.009(3) before December 31, 2014.
 (e)  This section expires September 1, 2015.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2013.
 * * * * *