Texas 2013 83rd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1605 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Zaffirini S.B. No. 1605
 (In the Senate - Filed March 8, 2013; March 20, 2013, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Transportation;
 April 11, 2013, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 7, Nays 0; April 11, 2013, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to an optional county fee for transportation projects.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subsection (a), Section 502.402, Transportation
 Code, is amended to read as follows:
 (a)  This section applies only to a county:
 (1)  that borders the United Mexican States;
 (2)  that has a population of more than 250,000
 [300,000]; and
 (3)  in which the largest municipality has a population
 of less than 400,000 [300,000].
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2013.
 * * * * *