Texas 2013 83rd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1611 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Ellis, Duncan, Hinojosa S.B. No. 1611
 (In the Senate - Filed March 8, 2013; March 20, 2013, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Criminal Justice;
 March 28, 2013, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 5, Nays 1; March 28, 2013,
 sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1611 By:  Hinojosa


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to discovery in a criminal case.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  This Act shall be known as the Michael Morton
 Act.
 SECTION 2.  Article 39.14, Code of Criminal Procedure, is
 amended by amending Subsection (a) and adding Subsections (c)
 through (j) to read as follows:
 (a)  Subject to the restrictions provided by Article 39.15,
 as soon as practicable after receiving a timely request from the
 defendant the state shall [Upon motion of the defendant showing
 good cause therefor and upon notice to the other parties, except as
 provided by Article 39.15, the court in which an action is pending
 shall order the State before or during trial of a criminal action
 therein pending or on trial to] produce and permit the inspection
 and the electronic duplication [copying] or photographing, by or on
 behalf of the defendant, of any offense reports or of any designated
 documents, papers, written or recorded statements [statement] of
 the defendant or a witness, including witness statements of law
 enforcement officers but not including[, (except written
 statements of witnesses and except] the work product of counsel for
 the state in the case and their investigators and their notes or
 report[)], books, accounts, letters, photographs, or objects or
 tangible things not otherwise privileged[,] which constitute or
 contain evidence material to any matter involved in the action and
 which are in the possession, custody, or control of the state or any
 person under contract with the state [State or any of its agencies].
 The state may provide electronically to or duplicate electronically
 for the defendant any documents, items, and information described
 by this article. The [order shall specify the time, place and
 manner of making the inspection and taking the copies and
 photographs of any of the aforementioned documents or tangible
 evidence; provided, however, that the] rights granted to the
 defendant under this article do [herein granted shall] not extend
 to written communications between the state and an agent,
 representative, or employee of the state. This article does not
 authorize [State or any of its agents or representatives or
 employees. Nothing in this Act shall authorize] the removal of the
 documents, items, or information [such evidence] from the
 possession of the state [State], and any inspection shall be in the
 presence of a representative of the state [State].
 (c)  If only a portion of the applicable document, item, or
 information is subject to discovery under this article, the state
 is not required to produce or permit the inspection of the remaining
 portion and may withhold or redact that portion. The state shall
 inform the defendant that a portion of the document, item, or
 information has been withheld or redacted. On request of the
 defendant, the court shall conduct a hearing to determine whether
 withholding or redaction is justified under this article or other
 law.
 (d)  On a showing of good cause specific to the case, the
 court may enter an appropriate protective order that a specified
 disclosure be denied, restricted, or deferred or that the attorney
 representing the defendant is prohibited from distributing to a
 third party offense reports or witness statements received from the
 state. For purposes of this subsection, "good cause" includes the
 probable loss, destruction, or fabrication of evidence, the
 probable compromise of an investigation by law enforcement, or
 evidence of intimidation, a threat of harm, or danger to the safety
 of the victim or witness. In the case of a pro se defendant, if the
 court orders the state to produce and permit the inspection of the
 document, item, or information under this subsection, the state
 shall permit the pro se defendant to inspect and review the
 document, item, or information but, notwithstanding Subsection
 (a), is not required to allow electronic duplication of the
 document, item, or information.
 (e)  Notwithstanding any other provision of this article,
 the state shall disclose to the defendant any exculpatory,
 impeachment, or mitigating document, item, or information in the
 possession, custody, or control of the state that tends to negate
 the guilt of the defendant or would tend to reduce the punishment
 for the offense charged.
 (f)  The state shall document or otherwise electronically
 record the documents, items, and information provided to the
 defendant under this article.
 (g)  Before accepting a plea of guilty or nolo contendere, or
 before trial, each party shall acknowledge in writing or on the
 record in open court the disclosure, receipt, and list of the
 documents, items, and information provided to the defendant under
 this article.
 (h)  If at any time before, during, or after trial the state
 discovers any additional documents, items, or information required
 to be disclosed under Subsection (e), the state shall promptly
 disclose the existence of the documents, items, or information to
 the defendant or the court.
 (i)  A court may order the defendant to pay costs related to
 discovery under this article, provided that costs may not exceed
 those provided for by Chapter 552, Government Code.
 (j)  To the extent of any conflict, this article prevails
 over Chapter 552, Government Code.
 SECTION 3.  The change in law made by this Act applies to the
 prosecution of an offense committed on or after the effective date
 of this Act. The prosecution of an offense committed before the
 effective date of this Act is covered by the law in effect when the
 offense was committed, and the former law is continued in effect for
 this purpose. For purposes of this section, an offense is committed
 before the effective date of this Act if any element of the offense
 occurs before the effective date.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect January 1, 2014.
 * * * * *