Texas 2013 83rd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB165 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Van de Putte S.B. No. 165
 (In the Senate - Filed January 8, 2013; January 29, 2013,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Transportation;
 March 11, 2013, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 9,
 Nays 0; March 11, 2013, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the issuance of specialty license plates to officers of
 the United States armed forces who graduated from certain United
 States military academies.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 504.309, Transportation Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 Sec. 504.309.  MILITARY ACADEMY LICENSE PLATES.  The
 department shall issue specialty license plates for persons who:
 (1)  are graduates of:
 (A)  the United States Military Academy;
 (B)  [,] the United States Naval Academy;
 (C)  [, or] the United States Air Force Academy;
 (D)  the United States Merchant Marine Academy; or
 (E)  the United States Coast Guard Academy; and
 (2)  are current or former commissioned officers of the
 United States armed forces.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2013.
 * * * * *