Texas 2013 83rd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1658 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Paxton S.B. No. 1658
 (In the Senate - Filed March 8, 2013; March 20, 2013, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Education; April 16, 2013,
 reported adversely, with favorable Committee Substitute by the
 following vote:  Yeas 7, Nays 0; April 16, 2013, sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1658 By:  Paxton


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the effect of certain state aid on school districts
 required to take action to equalize wealth under the school finance
 system.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  The heading to Section 41.0041, Education Code,
 is amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 41.0041.  EFFECT OF [ADDITIONAL] STATE AID [FOR TAX
 REDUCTION].
 SECTION 2.  Subsections (b), (c), and (d), Section 41.0041,
 Education Code, are amended to read as follows:
 (b)  When the commissioner initially identifies a school
 district under Section 41.004 as having a wealth per student for a
 school year that exceeds the equalized wealth level, the
 commissioner shall estimate:
 (1)  the amount of state revenue to which the district
 is entitled under Chapter 42 [Section 42.2516] for that school
 year; and
 (2)  the cost to the district to purchase attendance
 credits under Subchapter D in an amount sufficient to reduce the
 district's wealth per student to the equalized wealth level for
 that school year.
 (c)  If the commissioner determines that the amount
 described by Subsection (b)(1) exceeds the amount described by
 Subsection (b)(2), the commissioner shall notify the district of
 the commissioner's determination.  In lieu of exercising an option
 described by Section 41.003, the district's board of trustees may
 authorize the commissioner to withhold from the state revenue to
 which the district is entitled under Chapter 42 [Section 42.2516]
 an amount equal to the amount described by Subsection (b)(2).
 (d)  In calculating the amount of state revenue to be
 withheld from a school district under this section, the
 commissioner shall calculate the cost for the district to reduce
 the district's wealth per student to the equalized wealth level
 using the final attendance and tax rate data for the school year and
 shall award the district any available credit or discount under
 Subchapter D as if the district had exercised the option under
 Section 41.003(3) in a timely manner.  If the final amount
 calculated for the cost for the district to reduce the district's
 wealth per student to the equalized wealth level for a school year
 exceeds the amount of state revenue to which the district is
 entitled under Chapter 42 [Section 42.2516] for that year:
 (1)  the commissioner shall:
 (A)  withhold the entire amount of state revenue
 to which the district is entitled under Chapter 42 [Section
 42.2516] for that year; and
 (B)  withhold the additional amount of the cost
 for the district to reduce the district's wealth per student to the
 equalized wealth level for that year from the state revenue to which
 the district is entitled under Chapter 42 [Section 42.2516] for a
 subsequent school year, or if the additional amount exceeds the
 amount of state revenue to which the district is entitled, add the
 difference to the cost of the attendance credits that the district
 must purchase in the subsequent year; and
 (2)  the district is not required to take any further
 action to reduce its wealth per student for that year.
 SECTION 3.  Subsection (a), Section 57.32, Chapter 4 (S.B.
 1), Acts of the 82nd Legislature, 1st Called Session, 2011, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (a)  Effective September 1, 2017, the following provisions
 of the Education Code are repealed:
 (1)  [Section 41.0041;
 [(2)]  Subsections (b), (b-1), (b-2), (c), (d), (e),
 (f), (f-1), (f-2), (f-3), and (i), Section 42.2516;
 (2) [(3)]  Section 42.25161;
 (3) [(4)]  Subsection (c), Section 42.2523;
 (4) [(5)]  Subsection (g), Section 42.2524;
 (5) [(6)]  Subsection (c-1), Section 42.253; and
 (6) [(7)]  Section 42.261.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2013.
 * * * * *