Texas 2013 83rd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1708 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Rodriguez S.B. No. 1708
 (In the Senate - Filed March 8, 2013; March 25, 2013, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Government Organization;
 April 10, 2013, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 7, Nays 0; April 10, 2013,
 sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1708 By:  Rodriguez


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the acquisition of certain real property in El Paso
 County for the construction of facilities for the Department of
 Public Safety of the State of Texas.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter L, Chapter 2166, Government Code, is
 amended by adding Section 2166.554 to read as follows:
 Sec. 2166.554.  LEASE OF FEDERAL PROPERTY FOR CONSTRUCTION
 OF FACILITIES FOR DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC SAFETY. (a)  The Department
 of Public Safety of the State of Texas may enter into a long-term
 lease of a portion of federal real property known as Fort Bliss.
 (b)  A lease entered into under Subsection (a):
 (1)  is for the use and benefit of this state; and
 (2)  may be for a period or term until the real property
 is donated to the Department of Public Safety of the State of Texas.
 (c)  A new regional headquarters and other facilities for the
 Department of Public Safety of the State of Texas, including an
 evidence processing center and a driver's license office, may be
 constructed on the property described by Subsection (a).
 (d)  Section 2166.054(a) does not apply to the acquisition of
 property for and the construction of the headquarters and
 facilities described by Subsection (c).
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2013.
 * * * * *