Texas 2013 83rd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1729 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Nichols S.B. No. 1729
 (In the Senate - Filed March 8, 2013; March 25, 2013, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Transportation;
 April 8, 2013, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0; April 8, 2013,
 sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1729 By:  Nichols


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to an agreement between the Department of Public Safety
 and a county for the provision of renewal and duplicate driver's
 license and other identification certificate services; authorizing
 a fee.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter A, Chapter 521, Transportation Code,
 is amended by adding Section 521.008 to read as follows:
 Sec. 521.008.  AGREEMENT REGARDING THE PROVISION OF RENEWAL
 AND DUPLICATE DRIVER'S LICENSE AND OTHER IDENTIFICATION
 CERTIFICATE SERVICES.  (a)  The department may enter into an
 agreement with the commissioners court of a county to permit county
 employees to provide services at a county office relating to the
 issuance of renewal and duplicate driver's licenses, election
 identification certificates, and personal identification
 certificates, including:
 (1)  taking photographs;
 (2)  administering vision tests;
 (3)  updating a driver's license, election
 identification certificate, or personal identification certificate
 to change a name, address, or photograph;
 (4)  distributing and collecting information relating
 to donations under Section 521.401;
 (5)  collecting fees; and
 (6)  performing other basic ministerial functions and
 tasks necessary to issue renewal and duplicate driver's licenses,
 election identification certificates, and personal identification
 certificates.
 (b)  An agreement under Subsection (a) may not include
 training to administer an examination for driver's license
 applicants under Subchapter H.
 (c)  A participating county must remit to the department for
 deposit as required by this chapter fees collected for the issuance
 of a renewal or duplicate driver's license or personal
 identification certificate.
 (d)  A county office that provides written consent to the
 commissioners court may provide services under an agreement
 described by this section.
 (e)  The department shall provide all equipment and supplies
 necessary to perform the services described by Subsection (a),
 including network connectivity.
 (f)  The department shall adopt rules to administer this
 section.
 SECTION 2.  Subchapter R, Chapter 521, Transportation Code,
 is amended by adding Section 521.428 to read as follows:
 Sec. 521.428.  COUNTY FEE.  A county that provides services
 under an agreement described by Section 521.008 may collect an
 additional fee of up to $5 for each transaction provided that
 relates to driver's license and personal identification
 certificate services only.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2013.
 * * * * *