Texas 2013 83rd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1758 Introduced / Fiscal Note

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD    Austin, Texas      FISCAL NOTE, 83RD LEGISLATIVE REGULAR SESSION            April 15, 2013      TO: Honorable Jane Nelson, Chair, Senate Committee on Health & Human Services      FROM: Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board     IN RE:SB1758 by Uresti (Relating to the establishment of a task force to examine hiring and management practices of the Department of Family and Protective Services.), As Introduced    No significant fiscal implication to the State is anticipated.  The bill would amend Chapter 531 of the Government Code, relating to the establishment of a task force to examine hiring and management practices of the Department of Family and Protective Services (DFPS). The bill would create the task force, and charge the task force with undertaking an evaluation of hiring and management practices at DFPS. The task force would be required to submit a report to the designated legislative offices not later than September 1, 2014. Members of the task force would not be entitled to compensation or reimbursement for expenses. The task force would be abolished on September 1, 2015.  DFPS and the Health and Human Services Commission indicate the provisions of the bill could be implemented within existing resources.  The bill would be effective immediately with a two-thirds vote of all members elected to each house; otherwise the effective date would be September 1, 2013. Local Government Impact No fiscal implication to units of local government is anticipated.    Source Agencies:529 Health and Human Services Commission, 530 Family and Protective Services, Department of   LBB Staff:  UP, CL, NB, VJC    

LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD
Austin, Texas
FISCAL NOTE, 83RD LEGISLATIVE REGULAR SESSION
April 15, 2013





  TO: Honorable Jane Nelson, Chair, Senate Committee on Health & Human Services      FROM: Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board     IN RE:SB1758 by Uresti (Relating to the establishment of a task force to examine hiring and management practices of the Department of Family and Protective Services.), As Introduced  

TO: Honorable Jane Nelson, Chair, Senate Committee on Health & Human Services
FROM: Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board
IN RE: SB1758 by Uresti (Relating to the establishment of a task force to examine hiring and management practices of the Department of Family and Protective Services.), As Introduced

 Honorable Jane Nelson, Chair, Senate Committee on Health & Human Services 

 Honorable Jane Nelson, Chair, Senate Committee on Health & Human Services 

 Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board

 Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board

SB1758 by Uresti (Relating to the establishment of a task force to examine hiring and management practices of the Department of Family and Protective Services.), As Introduced

SB1758 by Uresti (Relating to the establishment of a task force to examine hiring and management practices of the Department of Family and Protective Services.), As Introduced



No significant fiscal implication to the State is anticipated.

No significant fiscal implication to the State is anticipated.



The bill would amend Chapter 531 of the Government Code, relating to the establishment of a task force to examine hiring and management practices of the Department of Family and Protective Services (DFPS). The bill would create the task force, and charge the task force with undertaking an evaluation of hiring and management practices at DFPS. The task force would be required to submit a report to the designated legislative offices not later than September 1, 2014. Members of the task force would not be entitled to compensation or reimbursement for expenses. The task force would be abolished on September 1, 2015.  DFPS and the Health and Human Services Commission indicate the provisions of the bill could be implemented within existing resources.  The bill would be effective immediately with a two-thirds vote of all members elected to each house; otherwise the effective date would be September 1, 2013.

The bill would amend Chapter 531 of the Government Code, relating to the establishment of a task force to examine hiring and management practices of the Department of Family and Protective Services (DFPS). The bill would create the task force, and charge the task force with undertaking an evaluation of hiring and management practices at DFPS. The task force would be required to submit a report to the designated legislative offices not later than September 1, 2014. Members of the task force would not be entitled to compensation or reimbursement for expenses. The task force would be abolished on September 1, 2015. 

DFPS and the Health and Human Services Commission indicate the provisions of the bill could be implemented within existing resources. 

The bill would be effective immediately with a two-thirds vote of all members elected to each house; otherwise the effective date would be September 1, 2013.

Local Government Impact

No fiscal implication to units of local government is anticipated.

Source Agencies: 529 Health and Human Services Commission, 530 Family and Protective Services, Department of

529 Health and Human Services Commission, 530 Family and Protective Services, Department of

LBB Staff: UP, CL, NB, VJC

 UP, CL, NB, VJC