S.B. No. 176 AN ACT relating to the distribution of certain consultants' reports. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: SECTION 1. Subchapter B, Chapter 2254, Government Code, is amended by adding Section 2254.041 to read as follows: Sec. 2254.041. DISTRIBUTION OF CONSULTANT REPORTS. (a) A consulting services contract must include provisions that allow the state agency contracting with the consultant and any other state agency and the legislature, at the contracting state agency's discretion, to distribute the consultant report, if any, and to post the report on the agency's Internet website or the website of a standing committee of the legislature. (b) This section does not affect the application of Chapter 552 to a consultant's report. SECTION 2. (a) Except as provided by Subsection (b) of this section, Section 2254.041, Government Code, as added by this Act, applies only to a consulting services contract entered into on or after the effective date of this Act. A consulting services contract entered into before the effective date of this Act is governed by the law in effect on the date the contract is entered into, and that law is continued in effect for that purpose. (b) Section 2254.041, Government Code, as added by this Act, does not apply to a consulting services contract entered into on or after the effective date of this Act if: (1) the state agency entered into negotiations for the consulting services contract before the effective date of this Act; and (2) the contract is executed before December 31, 2013. SECTION 3. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this Act takes effect September 1, 2013. ______________________________ ______________________________ President of the Senate Speaker of the House I hereby certify that S.B. No. 176 passed the Senate on March 13, 2013, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0; May 15, 2013, Senate refused to concur in House amendments and requested appointment of Conference Committee; May 16, 2013, House granted request of the Senate; May 24, 2013, Senate adopted Conference Committee Report by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0. ______________________________ Secretary of the Senate I hereby certify that S.B. No. 176 passed the House, with amendments, on May 8, 2013, by the following vote: Yeas 147, Nays 0, two present not voting; May 16, 2013, House granted request of the Senate for appointment of Conference Committee; May 23, 2013, House adopted Conference Committee Report by the following vote: Yeas 146, Nays 0, two present not voting. ______________________________ Chief Clerk of the House Approved: ______________________________ Date ______________________________ Governor