S.B. No. 1769 AN ACT relating to the creation of an advisory committee to examine the fingerprinting practices of juvenile probation departments. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: SECTION 1. FINGERPRINTING ADVISORY COMMITTEE. Not later than December 1, 2013, the Texas Juvenile Justice Board shall appoint an advisory committee to develop a plan to end the practice of fingerprinting children referred to a juvenile probation department for delinquent conduct, other than felony conduct. The plan must ensure that public safety and due process rights are protected. SECTION 2. APPOINTMENTS; PRESIDING OFFICER. (a) In making appointments to the advisory committee, the board shall include members who are interested parties, including: (1) chief juvenile probation officers; (2) juvenile prosecutors; (3) juvenile defense attorneys; (4) peace officers; (5) representatives of the Department of Family and Protective Services; (6) juvenile justice advocates; and (7) members of the public. (b) The board shall designate one of the members as presiding officer of the advisory committee. SECTION 3. REPORT. Not later than December 1, 2014, the advisory committee shall submit to the board the plan developed under Section 1. SECTION 4. COMPENSATION. Members of the advisory committee serve without compensation and are not entitled to reimbursement for expenses. SECTION 5. APPLICATION OF LAWS GOVERNING ADVISORY COMMITTEES. The advisory committee is not subject to Chapter 2110, Government Code. SECTION 6. EXPIRATION DATE. The advisory committee is abolished and this Act expires January 1, 2015. SECTION 7. EFFECTIVE DATE. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this Act takes effect September 1, 2013. ______________________________ ______________________________ President of the Senate Speaker of the House I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1769 passed the Senate on May 1, 2013, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0. ______________________________ Secretary of the Senate I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1769 passed the House on May 22, 2013, by the following vote: Yeas 145, Nays 2, one present not voting. ______________________________ Chief Clerk of the House Approved: ______________________________ Date ______________________________ Governor