Texas 2013 83rd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1775 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: West S.B. No. 1775
 (In the Senate - Filed March 8, 2013; March 25, 2013, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Education; April 15, 2013,
 reported adversely, with favorable Committee Substitute by the
 following vote:  Yeas 6, Nays 1, 1 present not voting;
 April 15, 2013, sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1775 By:  West


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to school campus information, student transfers, and the
 public education grant program.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 8.051, Education Code, is amended by
 adding Subsection (e) to read as follows:
 (e)  Each regional education service center shall
 consolidate and submit to the agency or the entity contracting with
 the agency under Section 25.0012(b) the school availability
 information required under Section 25.0012 for any school located
 in the area served by the center. Each school district and
 open-enrollment charter school shall provide the necessary
 information to the regional education service center once each
 year.  The information shall be submitted by the center in the
 manner and format specified by the agency or contracting entity.
 Each regional education service center shall provide additional
 campus information and enrollment services as required by the
 commissioner.
 SECTION 2.  Subchapter A, Chapter 25, Education Code, is
 amended by adding Section 25.0012 to read as follows:
 Sec. 25.0012.  SCHOOL AVAILABILITY INFORMATION. (a)  A
 school district, open-enrollment charter school, or regional
 education service center shall prominently display and maintain on
 the entity's Internet website a list that includes:
 (1)  each campus located within the district, area
 served by the school, or region;
 (2)  the number of students that may attend each
 campus;
 (3)  the number of students attending each campus;
 (4)  the number of available student positions at each
 campus, as determined by the district;
 (5)  intensive programs offered at each campus,
 including optional flexible school day and credit recovery
 programs;
 (6)  college and career readiness programs offered at
 each campus, including dual credit programs, international
 baccalaureate programs, advanced placement programs, magnet
 programs, and Advancement Via Individual Determination (AVID)
 programs; and
 (7)  expanded learning programs, including extended
 day programs, extended year programs, and 21st Century Community
 Learning Center programs.
 (b)  The agency may contract for the services of one or more
 contractors to develop, implement, maintain, and publicize an
 Internet website that enables the public to identify by zip code the
 school district campuses and open-enrollment charter schools
 located in a student's district of residence and contiguous
 districts that match identified performance and program offerings,
 including the program offerings in Subsections (a)(5)-(7). For
 each campus identified, the Internet website shall display the
 information specified in Subsections (a)(2) and (3) and the process
 by which a student may enroll in a campus that is not the campus to
 which the student is assigned.  In awarding a contract under this
 subsection, the agency must consider an applicant's demonstrated
 competence and qualifications in maximizing Internet website
 accessibility and ease of use.
 (c)  In addition to any amount appropriated by the
 legislature, the agency may accept funds from any other public or
 private entity to carry out the requirements of this section. Funds
 accepted under this subsection may not be accepted on terms
 inconsistent with the requirements of this section.
 SECTION 3.  Section 25.031, Education Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 25.031.  ASSIGNMENTS AND TRANSFERS; OPEN ENROLLMENT [IN
 DISCRETION OF GOVERNING BOARD]. (a)  In conformity with this
 subchapter and rules adopted by the commissioner, the board of
 trustees of a school district or the board of county school trustees
 or a school employee designated by the board shall [may] assign and
 transfer any student from one school facility or classroom to
 another within its jurisdiction.
 (b)  Except as otherwise provided by this section, a school
 district that has more applicants for a transfer to a school
 facility than available positions must give priority to students at
 risk of dropping out of school as defined by Section 29.081 and must
 fill the available positions by lottery.
 (c)  The board of trustees of a school district may adopt a
 policy that establishes admissions criteria, including audition or
 performance criteria, for admission to a campus or program,
 including a magnet campus or program, that offers specialized areas
 of study and focus for students.
 (d)  Except as otherwise provided by Subsection (b) or (c),
 by this subchapter, or by commissioner rule, a school district
 shall permit open enrollment in any campus in the district.
 (e)  In permitting transfers under this section, a school
 district may not discriminate on the basis of a student's race,
 ethnicity, sex, or socioeconomic status.
 (f)  A student permitted to transfer to a campus under this
 section may continue to attend that campus and the campuses to which
 students from that campus are regularly assigned for higher grade
 levels until the student graduates from high school.
 SECTION 4.  Section 29.201, Education Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 29.201.  PARENTAL CHOICE. Notwithstanding any other
 provision of this code, as provided by this subchapter an eligible
 student may attend a public school in the district in which the
 student resides or may use a public education grant to attend any
 other district chosen by the student's parent until the student
 decides to attend a school in a different district or graduates from
 high school.
 SECTION 5.  Subsection (b), Section 29.202, Education Code,
 is amended to read as follows:
 (b)  After a student has used a public education grant to
 attend a school in a district other than the district in which the
 student resides,[:
 [(1)]  the student does not become ineligible for the
 grant if the school on which the student's initial eligibility is
 based no longer meets the criteria under Subsection (a)[; and
 [(2)     the student becomes ineligible for the grant if
 the student is assigned to attend a school that does not meet the
 criteria under Subsection (a)].
 SECTION 6.  Subsections (c) and (d), Section 29.203,
 Education Code, are amended to read as follows:
 (c)  A school district is entitled to additional facilities
 assistance under Section 42.4101 if the district enrolls [agrees
 to:
 [(1)  accept] a number of students using public
 education grants that is at least one percent of the district's
 average daily attendance for the preceding school year[; and
 [(2)     provide services to each student until the
 student either voluntarily decides to attend a school in a
 different district or graduates from high school].
 (d)  [A school district chosen by a student's parent under
 Section 29.201 is entitled to accept or reject the application for
 the student to attend school in that district but may not use
 criteria that discriminate on the basis of a student's race,
 ethnicity, academic achievement, athletic abilities, language
 proficiency, sex, or socioeconomic status.] A school district that
 has more [acceptable] applicants for attendance under this
 subchapter than available positions must [give priority to students
 at risk of dropping out of school as defined by Section 29.081 and
 must] fill the available positions by lottery. However, to achieve
 continuity in education, a school district may give priority
 [preference over at-risk students to enrolled students and] to the
 siblings of enrolled students residing in the same household or
 other children residing in the same household as enrolled students
 for the convenience of parents, guardians, or custodians of those
 children.
 SECTION 7.  This Act applies beginning with the 2013-2014
 school year.
 SECTION 8.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2013.
 * * * * *