Texas 2013 83rd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1814 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Estes S.B. No. 1814
 (In the Senate - Filed March 8, 2013; March 25, 2013, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Agriculture, Rural Affairs,
 and Homeland Security; April 11, 2013, reported adversely, with
 favorable Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 3,
 Nays 0; April 11, 2013, sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1814 By:  Estes


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to a requirement that members of the Public Safety
 Commission hold a secret security clearance.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subsection (b), Section 411.003, Government
 Code, is amended to read as follows:
 (b)  The commission is composed of five citizens of this
 state appointed by the governor with the advice and consent of the
 senate.  Members must be selected because of their peculiar
 qualifications for the position and must reflect the diverse
 geographic regions and population groups of this state.  Members
 must have and maintain a secret security clearance granted by the
 United States government.  Appointments to the commission shall be
 made without regard to race, color, disability, sex, religion, age,
 or national origin.  In making an appointment the governor shall
 consider, among other things, the person's knowledge of laws,
 experience in the enforcement of law, honesty, integrity,
 education, training, and executive ability.
 SECTION 2.  The changes in law made by this Act apply to a
 member of the Public Safety Commission serving on or after the
 effective date of this Act.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2013.
 * * * * *