Texas 2013 83rd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1825 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Hegar S.B. No. 1825
 (In the Senate - Filed March 13, 2013; March 20, 2013, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Intergovernmental
 Relations; April 4, 2013, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 5, Nays 0; April 4, 2013, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the composition of the board of directors of the Fort
 Bend Subsidence District.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 8834.051, Special District Local Laws
 Code, is amended by amending Subsections (a) and (d) and adding
 Subsections (h) and (i) to read as follows:
 (a)  The district is governed by a board of 15 [13] directors
 appointed as provided by this section.
 (d)  The persons designated by Subsections (e), (f), [and]
 (g), and (h) shall appoint directors in January to fill vacancies
 caused by the expiration of directors' terms.  The district shall
 mail notice regarding the necessity of an appointment to the
 persons designated by Subsections (e), (f), [and] (g), and (h) not
 later than the 20th day before the date of the board's January
 meeting.
 (h)  The board of directors of the North Fort Bend Water
 Authority shall appoint two directors.
 (i)  The directors shall serve staggered terms as follows:
 (1)  five members appointed under Subsection (e) and
 four members appointed under Subsection (f) shall serve terms
 expiring on January 1 of odd-numbered years; and
 (2)  one member appointed under Subsection (e), two
 members appointed under Subsection (f), one member appointed under
 Subsection (g), and two members appointed under Subsection (h)
 shall serve terms expiring on January 1 of even-numbered years.
 SECTION 2.  As soon as practicable after the effective date
 of this Act, the board of directors of the North Fort Bend Water
 Authority shall appoint two members of the board of directors of the
 Fort Bend Subsidence District as provided by Section 8834.051,
 Special District Local Laws Code, as amended by this Act.
 SECTION 3.  The Fort Bend Subsidence District retains all
 the rights, powers, privileges, authority, duties, and functions
 that it had before the effective date of this Act.
 SECTION 4.  (a)  The legal notice of the intention to
 introduce this Act, setting forth the general substance of this
 Act, has been published as provided by law, and the notice and a
 copy of this Act have been furnished to all persons, agencies,
 officials, or entities to which they are required to be furnished
 under Section 59, Article XVI, Texas Constitution, and Chapter 313,
 Government Code.
 (b)  The governor, one of the required recipients, has
 submitted the notice and Act to the Texas Commission on
 Environmental Quality.
 (c)  The Texas Commission on Environmental Quality has filed
 its recommendations relating to this Act with the governor, the
 lieutenant governor, and the speaker of the house of
 representatives within the required time.
 (d)  All requirements of the constitution and laws of this
 state and the rules and procedures of the legislature with respect
 to the notice, introduction, and passage of this Act are fulfilled
 and accomplished.
 SECTION 5.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2013.
 * * * * *