Texas 2013 83rd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1833 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Uresti S.B. No. 1833
 (In the Senate - Filed March 14, 2013; March 20, 2013, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Economic Development;
 March 27, 2013, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 4,
 Nays 0; March 27, 2013, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the rate of the hotel occupancy tax in certain counties.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subsection (q), Section 352.003, Tax Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (q)  Except as otherwise provided by this subsection, the tax
 rate in a county authorized to impose the tax under Section
 352.002(a)(13) may not exceed seven percent of the price paid for a
 room in the hotel.  The county shall impose the tax authorized under
 Section 352.002(a)(13) at a rate that may not exceed two percent of
 the price paid for a room in a hotel if the hotel is located in:
 (1)  a municipality that imposes a tax under Chapter
 351 applicable to the hotel; or
 (2)  the extraterritorial jurisdiction of that
 municipality and the municipality imposes a tax in that area under
 Section 351.0025 applicable to the hotel [If a municipality in the
 county imposes a tax under Chapter 351, the county may impose the
 tax on a hotel to which the municipal tax applies at a rate that,
 when added to the municipal tax rate, does not exceed seven percent
 of the price paid for a room in the hotel].
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2013.
 * * * * *