Texas 2013 83rd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1889 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Eltife S.B. No. 1889
 (In the Senate - Filed April 12, 2013; April 15, 2013, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Health and Human Services;
 April 23, 2013, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 7,
 Nays 0; April 23, 2013, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the transport of a mental health patient who is not a
 resident of this state.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subdivision (12), Section 571.003, Health and
 Safety Code, is amended to read as follows:
 (12)  "Mental health facility" means:
 (A)  an inpatient or outpatient mental health
 facility operated by the department, a federal agency, a political
 subdivision, or any person;
 (B)  a community center or a facility operated by
 a community center; [or]
 (C)  that identifiable part of a general hospital
 in which diagnosis, treatment, and care for persons with mental
 illness is provided; or
 (D)  with respect to a reciprocal agreement
 entered into under Section 571.0081, any hospital or facility
 designated as a place of commitment by the department, a local
 mental health authority, and the contracting state or local
 authority.
 SECTION 2.  Subsections (a), (c), and (e), Section 571.008,
 Health and Safety Code, are amended to read as follows:
 (a)  The department may return a nonresident patient
 committed to a department mental health facility or other mental
 health facility under Section 571.0081 to the proper agency of the
 patient's state of residence.
 (c)  Subject to Section 571.0081, the [The] department may
 enter into reciprocal agreements with the state or local
 authorities, as defined by Section 571.0081, [proper agencies] of
 other states to facilitate the return of persons committed to
 mental health facilities in this state or another state to the
 states of their residence.
 (e)  The state returning a committed patient to another state
 shall bear the expenses of returning the patient, unless the state
 agrees to share costs under a reciprocal agreement under Section
 571.0081.
 SECTION 3.  Chapter 571, Health and Safety Code, is amended
 by adding Section 571.0081 to read as follows:
 Sec. 571.0081.  RETURN OF COMMITTED PATIENT TO STATE OF
 RESIDENCE; RECIPROCAL AGREEMENTS.  (a)  In this section, "state or
 local authority" means a state or local government authority or
 agency or a representative of a state or local government authority
 or agency acting in an official capacity.
 (b)  If a state or local authority of another state petitions
 the department, the department shall enter into a reciprocal
 agreement with the state or local authority to facilitate the
 return of persons committed to mental health facilities in this
 state to the state of their residence unless the department
 determines that the terms of the agreement are not acceptable.
 (c)  A reciprocal agreement entered into by the department
 under Subsection (b) must require the department to develop a
 process for returning persons committed to mental health facilities
 to their state of residence.  The process must:
 (1)  provide suitable care for the person committed to
 a mental health facility;
 (2)  use available resources efficiently; and
 (3)  consider commitment to a proximate mental health
 facility to facilitate the return of the committed patient to the
 patient's state of residence.
 (d)  For the purpose of this section, the department shall
 coordinate, as appropriate, with a mental health facility, a mental
 hospital, health service providers, courts, and law enforcement
 personnel located in the geographic area nearest the petitioning
 state.
 SECTION 4.  The change in law made by this Act to Chapter
 571, Health and Safety Code, applies only to a reciprocal agreement
 between the state and another entity entered into on or after the
 effective date of this Act.  A reciprocal agreement entered into
 between the state and another entity before the effective date of
 this Act is governed by the law in effect on the date the reciprocal
 agreement was entered into, and the former law is continued in
 effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 5.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2013.
 * * * * *