Texas 2013 83rd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1896 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Garcia S.B. No. 1896
 (In the Senate - Filed April 16, 2013; April 17, 2013, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Open Government;
 April 23, 2013, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 3,
 Nays 0; April 23, 2013, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the confidentiality of information in ad valorem tax
 appraisal records that identifies the home address of certain
 judges.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subdivision (2), Subsection (a-1), Section
 25.025, Tax Code, is amended to read as follows:
 (2)  "State judge" means:
 (A)  a judge, former judge, or retired judge of an
 appellate court, a district court, a statutory probate court, a
 constitutional county court, or a county court at law of this state;
 (B)  an associate judge appointed under Chapter
 201, Family Code, or Chapter 54A, Government Code, or a retired
 associate judge or former associate judge appointed under either
 law [that chapter]; [or]
 (C)  a justice of the peace;
 (D)  a master, magistrate, referee, hearing
 officer, or associate judge appointed under Chapter 54, Government
 Code; or
 (E)  a municipal court judge.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2013.
 * * * * *