Texas 2013 83rd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1907 Enrolled / Bill

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    S.B. No. 1907


 AN ACT
 relating to the transportation and storage of firearms and
 ammunition by concealed handgun license holders in private vehicles
 on the campuses of certain institutions of higher education.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter H, Chapter 411, Government Code, is
 amended by adding Section 411.2032 to read as follows:
 Sec. 411.2032.  TRANSPORTATION AND STORAGE OF FIREARMS AND
 AMMUNITION BY LICENSE HOLDERS IN PRIVATE VEHICLES ON CERTAIN
 CAMPUSES. (a)  For purposes of this section:
 (1)  "Campus" means all land and buildings owned or
 leased by an institution of higher education or private or
 independent institution of higher education.
 (2)  "Institution of higher education" and "private or
 independent institution of higher education" have the meanings
 assigned by Section 61.003, Education Code.
 (b)  An institution of higher education or private or
 independent institution of higher education in this state may not
 adopt or enforce any rule, regulation, or other provision or take
 any other action, including posting notice under Section 30.06,
 Penal Code, prohibiting or placing restrictions on the storage or
 transportation of a firearm or ammunition in a locked, privately
 owned or leased motor vehicle by a person, including a student
 enrolled at that institution, who holds a license to carry a
 concealed handgun under this subchapter and lawfully possesses the
 firearm or ammunition:
 (1)  on a street or driveway located on the campus of
 the institution; or
 (2)  in a parking lot, parking garage, or other parking
 area located on the campus of the institution.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2013.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1907 passed the Senate on
 April 30, 2013, by the following vote:  Yeas 27, Nays 4;
 May 24, 2013, Senate refused to concur in House amendments and
 requested appointment of Conference Committee; May 25, 2013, House
 granted request of the Senate; May 26, 2013, Senate adopted
 Conference Committee Report by the following vote:  Yeas 28,
 Nays 3.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1907 passed the House, with
 amendments, on May 9, 2013, by the following vote:  Yeas 124,
 Nays 13, three present not voting; May 25, 2013, House granted
 request of the Senate for appointment of Conference Committee;
 May 26, 2013, House adopted Conference Committee Report by the
 following vote:  Yeas 135, Nays 8, one present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor