By: Huffman, Nichols S.B. No. 202 (In the Senate - Filed February 19, 2013; February 25, 2013, read first time and referred to Committee on Government Organization; March 18, 2013, reported favorably by the following vote: Yeas 6, Nays 0; March 18, 2013, sent to printer.) A BILL TO BE ENTITLED AN ACT relating to the continuation and functions of the Texas Commission on the Arts. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: SECTION 1. Subsection (a), Section 444.002, Government Code, is amended to read as follows: (a) The Texas Commission on the Arts is subject to Chapter 325 (Texas Sunset Act). Unless continued in existence as provided by that chapter, the commission is abolished and this chapter expires September 1, 2025 [2013]. SECTION 2. The heading to Section 444.003, Government Code, is amended to read as follows: Sec. 444.003. COMPOSITION; TERMS. SECTION 3. Section 444.003, Government Code, is amended by amending Subsection (a) and adding Subsection (c) to read as follows: (a) The commission is composed of nine [17] members appointed by the governor with the advice and consent of the senate. The members must represent a diverse cross-section of the [all] fields of the arts and be widely known for their professional competence and experience in connection with the arts. At least two members must be residents of a county with a population of less than 50,000. Appointments to the commission shall be made without regard to the race, color, disability, sex, religion, age, or national origin of the appointees. (c) Members of the commission serve staggered terms of six years. SECTION 4. Section 444.024, Government Code, is amended by amending Subsection (a) and adding Subsection (a-1) to read as follows: (a) The commission may award grants in accordance with the commission's mission to advance the state economically and culturally by investing in the arts in this state. (a-1) An applicant for a grant of money from the commission shall specify in the grant application a minimum and maximum amount of money requested. SECTION 5. (a) The six positions on the Texas Commission on the Arts that have terms scheduled to expire on August 31, 2013, are abolished on that date. (b) Two of the six positions on the Texas Commission on the Arts with terms scheduled to expire on August 31, 2015, are abolished on that date. (c) In appointing members to the Texas Commission on the Arts for terms scheduled to begin September 1, 2015, the governor shall appoint three members to the commission for terms expiring August 31, 2021, and one member to the commission for a term expiring August 31, 2019. (d) In appointing members to the Texas Commission on the Arts for terms scheduled to begin September 1, 2017, the governor shall appoint three members to the commission for terms expiring August 31, 2023, and two members to the commission for terms expiring August 31, 2019. SECTION 6. This Act takes effect on the 91st day after the last day of the legislative session. * * * * *