Texas 2013 83rd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB202 Engrossed / Bill

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Huffman, Nichols S.B. No. 202


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the continuation and functions of the Texas Commission
 on the Arts.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subsection (a), Section 444.002, Government
 Code, is amended to read as follows:
 (a)  The Texas Commission on the Arts is subject to Chapter
 325 (Texas Sunset Act).  Unless continued in existence as provided
 by that chapter, the commission is abolished and this chapter
 expires September 1, 2025 [2013].
 SECTION 2.  The heading to Section 444.003, Government Code,
 is amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 444.003.  COMPOSITION; TERMS.
 SECTION 3.  Section 444.003, Government Code, is amended by
 amending Subsection (a) and adding Subsection (c) to read as
 follows:
 (a)  The commission is composed of nine [17] members
 appointed by the governor with the advice and consent of the senate.
 The members must represent a diverse cross-section of the [all]
 fields of the arts and be widely known for their professional
 competence and experience in connection with the arts. At least two
 members must be residents of a county with a population of less than
 50,000. Appointments to the commission shall be made without
 regard to the race, color, disability, sex, religion, age, or
 national origin of the appointees.
 (c)  Members of the commission serve staggered terms of six
 years.
 SECTION 4.  Section 444.024, Government Code, is amended by
 amending Subsection (a) and adding Subsection (a-1) to read as
 follows:
 (a)  The commission may award grants in accordance with the
 commission's mission to advance the state economically and
 culturally by investing in the arts in this state.
 (a-1)  An applicant for a grant of money from the commission
 shall specify in the grant application a minimum and maximum amount
 of money requested.
 SECTION 5.  (a)  The six positions on the Texas Commission
 on the Arts that have terms scheduled to expire on August 31, 2013,
 are abolished on that date.
 (b)  Two of the six positions on the Texas Commission on the
 Arts with terms scheduled to expire on August 31, 2015, are
 abolished on that date.
 (c)  In appointing members to the Texas Commission on the
 Arts for terms scheduled to begin September 1, 2015, the governor
 shall appoint three members to the commission for terms expiring
 August 31, 2021, and one member to the commission for a term
 expiring August 31, 2019.
 (d)  In appointing members to the Texas Commission on the
 Arts for terms scheduled to begin September 1, 2017, the governor
 shall appoint three members to the commission for terms expiring
 August 31, 2023, and two members to the commission for terms
 expiring August 31, 2019.
 SECTION 6.  This Act takes effect on the 91st day after the
 last day of the legislative session.