Texas 2013 83rd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB202 Enrolled / Bill

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    S.B. No. 202


 AN ACT
 relating to the continuation and functions of the Texas Commission
 on the Arts.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subsection (a), Section 444.002, Government
 Code, is amended to read as follows:
 (a)  The Texas Commission on the Arts is subject to Chapter
 325 (Texas Sunset Act).  Unless continued in existence as provided
 by that chapter, the commission is abolished and this chapter
 expires September 1, 2025 [2013].
 SECTION 2.  The heading to Section 444.003, Government Code,
 is amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 444.003.  COMPOSITION; TERMS.
 SECTION 3.  Section 444.003, Government Code, is amended by
 amending Subsection (a) and adding Subsection (c) to read as
 follows:
 (a)  The commission is composed of nine [17] members
 appointed by the governor with the advice and consent of the senate.
 The members must represent a diverse cross-section of the [all]
 fields of the arts and be widely known for their professional
 competence and experience in connection with the arts. At least two
 members must be residents of a county with a population of less than
 50,000. Appointments to the commission shall be made without
 regard to the race, color, disability, sex, religion, age, or
 national origin of the appointees.
 (c)  Members of the commission serve staggered terms of six
 years.
 SECTION 4.  Section 444.024, Government Code, is amended by
 amending Subsection (a) and adding Subsection (a-1) to read as
 follows:
 (a)  The commission may award grants in accordance with the
 commission's mission to advance the state economically and
 culturally by investing in the arts in this state.
 (a-1)  An applicant for a grant of money from the commission
 shall specify in the grant application a minimum and maximum amount
 of money requested.
 SECTION 5.  (a)  The six positions on the Texas Commission
 on the Arts that have terms scheduled to expire on August 31, 2013,
 are abolished on that date.
 (b)  Two of the six positions on the Texas Commission on the
 Arts with terms scheduled to expire on August 31, 2015, are
 abolished on that date.
 (c)  In appointing members to the Texas Commission on the
 Arts for terms scheduled to begin September 1, 2015, the governor
 shall appoint three members to the commission for terms expiring
 August 31, 2021, and one member to the commission for a term
 expiring August 31, 2019.  Two of the three members appointed to the
 commission for terms expiring August 31, 2021, must be residents of
 a county with a population of less than 50,000, as provided by
 Section 444.003, Government Code.
 (d)  In appointing members to the Texas Commission on the
 Arts for terms scheduled to begin September 1, 2017, the governor
 shall appoint three members to the commission for terms expiring
 August 31, 2023, and two members to the commission for terms
 expiring August 31, 2019.
 (e)  To the extent that the reduction in positions on the
 Texas Commission on the Arts under this Act causes the composition
 of the commission to violate the residency requirement of
 Subsection (a), Section 444.003, Government Code, that provision of
 law is suspended from the effective date of this Act until September
 1, 2015.
 SECTION 6.  This Act takes effect on the 91st day after the
 last day of the legislative session.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 202 passed the Senate on
 March 27, 2013, by the following vote: Yeas 30, Nays 0; and that
 the Senate concurred in House amendment on May 7, 2013, by the
 following vote: Yeas 29, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 202 passed the House, with
 amendment, on April 30, 2013, by the following vote: Yeas 118,
 Nays 26, one present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor