Texas 2013 83rd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB21 Enrolled / Bill

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    S.B. No. 21


 AN ACT
 relating to drug screening or testing as a condition for the receipt
 of unemployment compensation benefits by certain individuals.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  This Act shall be known as the Ken Legler Act.
 SECTION 2.  Section 207.021, Labor Code, is amended by
 adding Subsection (b-1) to read as follows:
 (b-1)  An individual for whom suitable work is available only
 in an occupation designated by United States Department of Labor
 regulation as an occupation that regularly conducts preemployment
 drug testing is available for work for purposes of Subsection
 (a)(4) only if the individual complies with the applicable
 requirements of the drug screening and testing program administered
 by the commission under Section 207.026. The commission shall
 adopt rules for determining the type of work that is suitable for an
 individual for purposes of this subsection.
 SECTION 3.  Subchapter B, Chapter 207, Labor Code, is
 amended by adding Section 207.026 to read as follows:
 Sec. 207.026.  DRUG SCREENING OR TESTING AS CONDITION OF
 BENEFIT ELIGIBILITY FOR CERTAIN APPLICANTS AND RECIPIENTS.
 (a)  The commission by rule shall adopt a drug screening and
 testing program as part of the requirements for the receipt of
 benefits under this subtitle by an individual to whom Section
 207.021(b-1) applies. The program must:
 (1)  comply with the drug testing requirements of 49
 C.F.R. Part 382 or other similar national requirements for drug
 testing programs recognized by the commission; and
 (2)  be designed to protect the rights of benefit
 applicants and recipients.
 (b)  Under the program, each individual to whom Section
 207.021(b-1) applies who files an initial claim must submit to and
 pass a drug screening assessment developed and administered by or
 on behalf of the commission for purposes of this subsection as a
 prerequisite to receiving benefits under this subtitle. The
 assessment tool used under this subsection must consist of a
 written questionnaire to be completed by the individual applying
 for benefits and must be designed to accurately determine the
 reasonable likelihood that an individual is using a substance that
 is subject to regulation under Chapter 481, Health and Safety Code.
 An individual whose drug screening assessment indicates a
 reasonable likelihood of use by the individual of a substance
 subject to regulation under that chapter must submit to and pass a
 drug test administered by or on behalf of the commission to
 establish the individual's eligibility for benefits under this
 subtitle.  An individual who fails a drug test required under this
 subsection under a final determination or decision under this
 section is not eligible to receive benefits under this subtitle
 until the individual has passed a subsequent drug test administered
 by or on behalf of the commission not earlier than four weeks after
 the date the individual submitted to the failed drug test.
 (c)  Notwithstanding Subsection (b), an individual is not
 ineligible to receive benefits based on the individual's failure to
 pass a drug test if, on the basis of evidence presented by the
 individual, the commission determines that, subject to Section
 207.021(a)(4):
 (1)  the individual is participating in a treatment
 program for drug abuse;
 (2)  the individual enrolls in and attends a treatment
 program for drug abuse not later than the seventh day after the date
 initial notice of the failed drug test is sent to the individual; or
 (3)  the failure to pass the test is caused by the use
 of a substance that was prescribed by a health care practitioner as
 medically necessary for the individual.
 (d)  The commission shall prescribe procedures for providing
 initial notice to an individual who fails a drug test under
 Subsection (b), for an appeal under Chapter 212, and for the
 retaking of a failed drug test by an individual under this section.
 The procedures must provide:
 (1)  for prompt initial notice by mail to an individual
 who fails a drug test under Subsection (b) regarding:
 (A)  the fact of the individual's failure of the
 drug test;
 (B)  the manner in which the individual may notify
 the commission that the individual has enrolled in and is attending
 a treatment program for drug abuse;
 (C)  the manner in which the individual may appeal
 and retake the failed drug test; and
 (D)  common potential causes of a false positive
 test result;
 (2)  for privacy with regard to the individual's drug
 test result until not later than the 14th day after the date the
 initial notice of the failed drug test was mailed to the individual
 during which time the individual may appeal and retake the failed
 drug test; and
 (3)  that a determination or decision that an
 individual has failed a drug test under this section becomes final
 on:
 (A)  the 15th day after the date the initial
 notice of the failed drug test was mailed to the individual if the
 individual does not appeal and retake the individual's failed drug
 test as provided by this section; or
 (B)  the date that a retest conducted pursuant to
 an appeal by the individual as provided by this section confirms the
 positive drug test result.
 (e)  The commission shall administer the program under this
 section using existing administrative funds and any funds
 appropriated to the commission for the purposes of this section.
 SECTION 4.  The changes in law made by this Act apply only to
 a claim for unemployment compensation benefits that is filed with
 the Texas Workforce Commission on or after February 1, 2014.
 SECTION 5.  If before implementing any provision of this Act
 a state agency determines that a waiver or authorization from a
 federal agency is necessary for implementation of that provision,
 the agency affected by the provision shall request the waiver or
 authorization and may delay implementing that provision until the
 waiver or authorization is granted.
 SECTION 6.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2013.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 21 passed the Senate on
 April 11, 2013, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0; and that
 the Senate concurred in House amendments on May 25, 2013, by the
 following vote: Yeas 30, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 21 passed the House, with
 amendments, on May 22, 2013, by the following vote: Yeas 104,
 Nays 42, one present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor