Texas 2013 83rd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB242 Introduced / Analysis

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    BILL ANALYSIS        Senate Research Center   S.B. 242     83R4620 NC-D   By: Carona         Veteran Affairs & Military Installations         2/20/2013         As Filed    

BILL ANALYSIS

 

 

Senate Research Center S.B. 242
83R4620 NC-D By: Carona
 Veteran Affairs & Military Installations
 2/20/2013
 As Filed

Senate Research Center

S.B. 242

83R4620 NC-D

By: Carona

 

Veteran Affairs & Military Installations

 

2/20/2013

 

As Filed

       AUTHOR'S / SPONSOR'S STATEMENT OF INTENT   Pursuant to H.B. 2643 of the 82nd Legislature, Regular Session, 2011, the Texas Department of Licensing and Regulation (TDLR) credits verified air conditioning and refrigeration military experience toward the licensing requirements under Section 1302.255 (Eligibility Requirements), Occupations Code. Since the implementation of this statutory change, at least five applicants have claimed the military service credit.   In recognition of the benefits that a similar program could provide to veterans who seek to utilize their military experience in other areas in a civilian career, S.B. 242 will expand the practice of crediting military service to all the occupational licenses that are overseen by TDLR.   S.B. 242 creates a new section under Chapter 51 of the Occupations Code, to require TDLR to credit verified military service, training, or education towards TDLR's licensing requirements. TDLR examination requirements are excluded from this provision. In addition, S.B. 242 instructs the Texas Commission on Licensing and Regulation to adopt rules necessary to implement this change.   As proposed, S.B. 242 amends current law relating to the eligibility requirements for certain occupational licenses issued to applicants with military experience.   RULEMAKING AUTHORITY   Rulemaking authority is expressly granted to the Texas Commission of Licensing and Regulation in SECTION 1 (Section 51.403, Occupations Code) and SECTION 2 of this bill.   SECTION BY SECTION ANALYSIS   SECTION 1. Amends Subchapter H, Chapter 51, Occupations Code, by adding Section 51.4013, as follows:   Sec. 51.4013. LICENSE ELIGIBILITY REQUIREMENTS FOR APPLICANTS WITH MILITARY EXPERIENCE. (a) Requires the Texas Department of Licensing and Regulation (TDLR), notwithstanding any other law, to credit verified military service, training, or education toward the licensing requirements, other than examination requirements, for a license issued by TDLR.   (b) Requires the Texas Commission of Licensing and Regulation (TCLR) to adopt rules necessary to implement this section.   SECTION 2. (a) Makes application of this Act prospective to May 1, 2014.   (b) Requires TCLR to adopt rules under Section 51.4013, Occupations Code, as added by this Act, not later than March 1, 2014.   SECTION 3. Effective date: upon passage or September 1, 2013. 

 

 

 

AUTHOR'S / SPONSOR'S STATEMENT OF INTENT

 

Pursuant to H.B. 2643 of the 82nd Legislature, Regular Session, 2011, the Texas Department of Licensing and Regulation (TDLR) credits verified air conditioning and refrigeration military experience toward the licensing requirements under Section 1302.255 (Eligibility Requirements), Occupations Code. Since the implementation of this statutory change, at least five applicants have claimed the military service credit.

 

In recognition of the benefits that a similar program could provide to veterans who seek to utilize their military experience in other areas in a civilian career, S.B. 242 will expand the practice of crediting military service to all the occupational licenses that are overseen by TDLR.

 

S.B. 242 creates a new section under Chapter 51 of the Occupations Code, to require TDLR to credit verified military service, training, or education towards TDLR's licensing requirements. TDLR examination requirements are excluded from this provision. In addition, S.B. 242 instructs the Texas Commission on Licensing and Regulation to adopt rules necessary to implement this change.

 

As proposed, S.B. 242 amends current law relating to the eligibility requirements for certain occupational licenses issued to applicants with military experience.

 

RULEMAKING AUTHORITY

 

Rulemaking authority is expressly granted to the Texas Commission of Licensing and Regulation in SECTION 1 (Section 51.403, Occupations Code) and SECTION 2 of this bill.

 

SECTION BY SECTION ANALYSIS

 

SECTION 1. Amends Subchapter H, Chapter 51, Occupations Code, by adding Section 51.4013, as follows:

 

Sec. 51.4013. LICENSE ELIGIBILITY REQUIREMENTS FOR APPLICANTS WITH MILITARY EXPERIENCE. (a) Requires the Texas Department of Licensing and Regulation (TDLR), notwithstanding any other law, to credit verified military service, training, or education toward the licensing requirements, other than examination requirements, for a license issued by TDLR.

 

(b) Requires the Texas Commission of Licensing and Regulation (TCLR) to adopt rules necessary to implement this section.

 

SECTION 2. (a) Makes application of this Act prospective to May 1, 2014.

 

(b) Requires TCLR to adopt rules under Section 51.4013, Occupations Code, as added by this Act, not later than March 1, 2014.

 

SECTION 3. Effective date: upon passage or September 1, 2013.