Texas 2013 83rd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB250 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: West S.B. No. 250
 (In the Senate - Filed January 25, 2013; January 29, 2013,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Jurisprudence;
 February 20, 2013, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas
 5, Nays 0; February 20, 2013, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the requirements of using certain technology to conduct
 certain mental health hearings or proceedings.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subsection (a), Section 574.202, Health and
 Safety Code, is amended to read as follows:
 (a)  A judge or magistrate may permit a physician or a
 nonphysician mental health professional to testify at a hearing or
 proceeding by closed-circuit video teleconferencing if:
 (1)  closed-circuit video teleconferencing is
 available to the judge or magistrate for that purpose;
 (2)  the proposed patient and the attorney representing
 the proposed patient do not file with the court a written objection
 to the use of closed-circuit video teleconferencing;
 (3)  the closed-circuit video teleconferencing system
 provides for a simultaneous, compressed full-motion video and
 interactive communication of image and sound between all persons
 involved in the hearing; [and]
 (4)  on request of the proposed patient, the proposed
 patient and the proposed patient's attorney can communicate
 privately without being recorded or heard by the judge or
 magistrate or by the attorney representing the state; and
 (5)  the proposed patient is in the same location for
 the hearing or proceeding as the proposed patient's attorney.
 SECTION 2.  Subsection (a), Section 574.203, Health and
 Safety Code, is amended to read as follows:
 (a)  A hearing may be conducted in accordance with this
 chapter but conducted by secure electronic means, including
 satellite transmission, closed-circuit television transmission, or
 any other method of two-way electronic communication that is
 secure, available to the parties, approved by the court, and
 capable of visually and audibly recording the proceedings, if:
 (1)  written consent to the use of a secure electronic
 communication method for the hearing is filed with the court by:
 (A)  the proposed patient or the attorney
 representing the proposed patient; and
 (B)  the county or district attorney, as
 appropriate;
 (2)  the secure electronic communication method
 provides for a simultaneous, compressed full-motion video, and
 interactive communication of image and sound among the judge or
 associate judge, the county or district attorney, the attorney
 representing the proposed patient, and the proposed patient; [and]
 (3)  on request of the proposed patient or the attorney
 representing the proposed patient, the proposed patient and the
 attorney can communicate privately without being recorded or heard
 by the judge or associate judge or by the county or district
 attorney; and
 (4)  the proposed patient is in the same location for
 the hearing as the proposed patient's attorney.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2013.
 * * * * *