Texas 2013 83rd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB268 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Seliger S.B. No. 268
 (In the Senate - Filed January 28, 2013; February 5, 2013,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Jurisprudence;
 February 20, 2013, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 4, Nays 0; February 20, 2013, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the application of the professional prosecutors law to
 the district attorney for the 287th Judicial District.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 46.002, Government Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 46.002.  PROSECUTORS SUBJECT TO CHAPTER.  This chapter
 applies to the state prosecuting attorney, all county prosecutors,
 and the following state prosecutors:
 (1)  the district attorneys for Kenedy and Kleberg
 Counties and for the 1st, 2nd, 8th, 9th, 12th, 18th, 21st, 23rd,
 25th, 26th, 27th, 29th, 31st, 32nd, 33rd, 34th, 35th, 36th, 38th,
 39th, 42nd, 43rd, 46th, 47th, 49th, 50th, 51st, 52nd, 53rd, 63rd,
 64th, 66th, 69th, 70th, 76th, 81st, 83rd, 84th, 85th, 88th, 90th,
 97th, 100th, 105th, 106th, 109th, 110th, 112th, 118th, 119th,
 123rd, 142nd, 143rd, 145th, 156th, 159th, 173rd, 196th, 198th,
 216th, 220th, 229th, 235th, 253rd, 258th, 259th, 266th, 268th,
 271st, 286th, 287th, 329th, 344th, 349th, 355th, and 506th judicial
 districts;
 (2)  the criminal district attorneys for the counties
 of Anderson, Austin, Bastrop, Bexar, Bowie, Brazoria, Caldwell,
 Calhoun, Cass, Collin, Comal, Dallas, Deaf Smith, Denton, Eastland,
 Fannin, Galveston, Grayson, Gregg, Harrison, Hays, Hidalgo,
 Jasper, Jefferson, Kaufman, Lubbock, McLennan, Madison, Navarro,
 Newton, Panola, Polk, Randall, Rockwall, San Jacinto, Smith,
 Tarrant, Taylor, Tyler, Upshur, Van Zandt, Victoria, Walker,
 Waller, Wichita, Wood, and Yoakum; and
 (3)  the county attorneys performing the duties of
 district attorneys in the counties of Andrews, Callahan, Cameron,
 Castro, Colorado, Crosby, Ellis, Falls, Freestone, Lamar, Lamb,
 Lampasas, Lee, Limestone, Marion, Milam, Morris, Ochiltree,
 Orange, Rains, Red River, Robertson, Rusk, Swisher, Terry, Webb,
 and Willacy.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2013.
 * * * * *