Texas 2013 83rd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB270 Enrolled / Bill

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    S.B. No. 270


 AN ACT
 relating to a limited exception to the prohibition on releasing
 personal information about a juror collected during the jury
 selection process in certain cases.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Article 35.29, Code of Criminal Procedure, is
 amended to read as follows:
 Art. 35.29.  PERSONAL INFORMATION ABOUT JURORS.  (a)  Except
 as provided by Subsections (b) and (c), information [Information]
 collected by the court or by a prosecuting attorney during the jury
 selection process about a person who serves as a juror, including
 the juror's home address, home telephone number, social security
 number, driver's license number, and other personal information, is
 confidential and may not be disclosed by the court, the prosecuting
 attorney, the defense counsel, or any court personnel.
 (b)  On [except on] application by a party in the trial, or on
 application by a bona fide member of the news media acting in such
 capacity, to the court for the disclosure of information described
 by Subsection (a), the court shall, on [in which the person is
 serving or did serve as a juror. On] a showing of good cause, [the
 court shall] permit disclosure of the information sought.
 (c)  The defense counsel may disclose information described
 by Subsection (a) to successor counsel representing the same
 defendant in a proceeding under Article 11.071 without application
 to the court or a showing of good cause.
 SECTION 2.  The change in law made by this Act applies to an
 application for a writ of habeas corpus under Article 11.071, Code
 of Criminal Procedure, that is pending on the effective date of this
 Act or filed on or after that date.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2013.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 270 passed the Senate on
 March 21, 2013, by the following vote:  Yeas 31, Nays 0;
 May 21, 2013, Senate refused to concur in House amendments and
 requested appointment of Conference Committee; May 22, 2013, House
 granted request of the Senate; May 26, 2013, Senate adopted
 Conference Committee Report by the following vote:  Yeas 31,
 Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 270 passed the House, with
 amendments, on May 16, 2013, by the following vote:  Yeas 143,
 Nays 0, two present not voting; May 22, 2013, House granted request
 of the Senate for appointment of Conference Committee;
 May 25, 2013, House adopted Conference Committee Report by the
 following vote:  Yeas 144, Nays 0, two present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor