Texas 2013 83rd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB281 Enrolled / Bill

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    S.B. No. 281


 AN ACT
 relating to the administration and powers of the Red River
 Authority of Texas.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Chapter 279, Acts of the 56th Legislature,
 Regular Session, 1959, is amended by adding Section 7a to read as
 follows:
 Sec. 7a.  The Authority's Board of Directors or a Board
 committee may hold a meeting by telephone conference call, by video
 conference call, or through communications over the Internet, in
 accordance with procedures provided by Subchapter F, Chapter 551,
 Government Code, if holding the meeting in that way is determined to
 be necessary or convenient by the Board president or any three Board
 members.
 SECTION 2.  Section 19, Chapter 279, Acts of the 56th
 Legislature, Regular Session, 1959, is amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 19.  Said Authority shall have and may exercise such
 functions, powers, authority, rights and duties as may permit the
 accomplishment of the purposes for which it is created, including
 investigating and planning, acquiring, constructing, maintaining
 and operating of all necessary properties, lands, rights,
 tenements, easements, improvements, reservoirs, dams, canals,
 laterals, plants, works and facilities which it may deem necessary
 or proper for the accomplishment of said purposes, including the
 acquisition within and/or without said Authority of lands,
 rights-of-way, surface water rights, groundwater rights, if
 purchased, as provided by Section 19a, and all other properties,
 tenements, easements and all other rights incident, helpful to, or
 in aid of carrying out the purposes of said Authority as herein
 defined; provided, however, that said Authority shall not engage in
 the generation or distribution of electric power except as provided
 by Section 14b of this Act. The right of eminent domain shall not be
 exercised or extend beyond the boundaries of this District.
 SECTION 3.  Chapter 279, Acts of the 56th Legislature,
 Regular Session, 1959, is amended by adding Section 19a to read as
 follows:
 Sec. 19a.  The Authority may purchase groundwater rights in
 a county in the Authority's territory only if:
 (1)  there is a groundwater conservation district that
 has jurisdiction over water wells located in the county; or
 (2)  in the case where a county is not in the
 jurisdiction of a groundwater conservation district, the
 commissioners court of the county approves the purchase of
 groundwater rights by the Authority in the county.
 SECTION 4.  Section 25, Chapter 279, Acts of the 56th
 Legislature, Regular Session, 1959, is amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 25.  Nothing in this Act shall be construed as
 authorizing the Authority to acquire or[,] regulate [or control in
 any way] underground water or underground water rights by
 condemnation or [purchase or otherwise or to develop,] regulate [or
 control] the use of underground water resources in any manner [.
 This Act is intended to govern and shall be construed to govern and
 apply to surface water only].
 SECTION 5.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2013.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 281 passed the Senate on
 March 26, 2013, by the following vote:  Yeas 31, Nays 0;
 May 21, 2013, Senate refused to concur in House amendments and
 requested appointment of Conference Committee; May 22, 2013, House
 granted request of the Senate; May 26, 2013, Senate adopted
 Conference Committee Report by the following vote:  Yeas 31,
 Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 281 passed the House, with
 amendments, on May 20, 2013, by the following vote:  Yeas 147,
 Nays 0, two present not voting; May 22, 2013, House granted request
 of the Senate for appointment of Conference Committee;
 May 25, 2013, House adopted Conference Committee Report by the
 following vote:  Yeas 139, Nays 1, two present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor