Texas 2013 83rd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB293 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Williams S.B. No. 293
 (In the Senate - Filed January 29, 2013; February 5, 2013,
 read first time and referred to Select Committee on Open
 Government; February 27, 2013, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 4, Nays 0; February 27, 2013, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the authority of certain water districts to hold
 meetings by teleconference or videoconference.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter F, Chapter 551, Government Code, is
 amended by adding Section 551.131 to read as follows:
 Sec. 551.131.  WATER DISTRICTS.  (a)  In this section,
 "water district" means a river authority, groundwater conservation
 district, water control and improvement district, or other district
 created under Section 52, Article III, or Section 59, Article XVI,
 Texas Constitution.
 (b)  This section applies only to a water district whose
 territory includes land in three or more counties.
 (c)  A meeting held by telephone conference call or video
 conference call authorized by this section may be held only if:
 (1)  the meeting is a special called meeting and
 immediate action is required; and
 (2)  the convening at one location of a quorum of the
 governing body of the applicable water district is difficult or
 impossible.
 (d)  A meeting held by telephone conference call must
 otherwise comply with the procedures under Sections 551.125(c),
 (d), (e), and (f).
 (e)  A meeting held by video conference call is subject to
 the notice requirements applicable to other meetings.  In addition,
 a meeting held by video conference call shall:
 (1)  be visible and audible to the public at the
 location specified in the notice of the meeting as the location of
 the meeting;
 (2)  be recorded by audio and video; and
 (3)  have two-way audio and video communications with
 each participant in the meeting during the entire meeting.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2013.
 * * * * *