Texas 2013 83rd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB312 Senate Committee Report / Fiscal Note

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD    Austin, Texas      FISCAL NOTE, 83RD LEGISLATIVE REGULAR SESSION            April 5, 2013      TO: Honorable Jane Nelson, Chair, Senate Committee on Health & Human Services      FROM: Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board     IN RE:SB312 by Hegar (Relating to the regulation of speech-language pathology and audiology and the fitting and dispensing of hearing instruments.), Committee Report 1st House, Substituted    No significant fiscal implication to the State is anticipated.  The bill would amend Chapters 401 and 402 of the Occupations Code, related to the regulation of speech-language pathology and audiology and the fitting and dispensing of hearing instruments. The bill would impact the State Board of Examiners for Speech-Language Pathology and Audiology and the State Committee of Examiners in the Fitting and Dispensing of Health Instruments Committee, both licensing boards that are administratively attached to the Department of State Health Services (DSHS). DSHS indicates that any rule and administrative modifications necessary to implement the bill would be absorbed within existing resources. The agency further notes that implementation of Section 9 of the bill, which repeals language related to certain licenses, would not impact revenue as the program is not currently exercising the authority that would be repealed. The bill would take effect September 1, 2013 and would require that the board and committee modify specified rules by January 1, 2014. The bill would apply to an application for a license filed on or after January 1, 2015.  Local Government Impact No significant fiscal implication to units of local government is anticipated.    Source Agencies:537 State Health Services, Department of   LBB Staff:  UP, CL, JTe, NB    

LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD
Austin, Texas
FISCAL NOTE, 83RD LEGISLATIVE REGULAR SESSION
April 5, 2013





  TO: Honorable Jane Nelson, Chair, Senate Committee on Health & Human Services      FROM: Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board     IN RE:SB312 by Hegar (Relating to the regulation of speech-language pathology and audiology and the fitting and dispensing of hearing instruments.), Committee Report 1st House, Substituted  

TO: Honorable Jane Nelson, Chair, Senate Committee on Health & Human Services
FROM: Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board
IN RE: SB312 by Hegar (Relating to the regulation of speech-language pathology and audiology and the fitting and dispensing of hearing instruments.), Committee Report 1st House, Substituted

 Honorable Jane Nelson, Chair, Senate Committee on Health & Human Services 

 Honorable Jane Nelson, Chair, Senate Committee on Health & Human Services 

 Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board

 Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board

SB312 by Hegar (Relating to the regulation of speech-language pathology and audiology and the fitting and dispensing of hearing instruments.), Committee Report 1st House, Substituted

SB312 by Hegar (Relating to the regulation of speech-language pathology and audiology and the fitting and dispensing of hearing instruments.), Committee Report 1st House, Substituted



No significant fiscal implication to the State is anticipated.

No significant fiscal implication to the State is anticipated.



The bill would amend Chapters 401 and 402 of the Occupations Code, related to the regulation of speech-language pathology and audiology and the fitting and dispensing of hearing instruments. The bill would impact the State Board of Examiners for Speech-Language Pathology and Audiology and the State Committee of Examiners in the Fitting and Dispensing of Health Instruments Committee, both licensing boards that are administratively attached to the Department of State Health Services (DSHS). DSHS indicates that any rule and administrative modifications necessary to implement the bill would be absorbed within existing resources. The agency further notes that implementation of Section 9 of the bill, which repeals language related to certain licenses, would not impact revenue as the program is not currently exercising the authority that would be repealed. The bill would take effect September 1, 2013 and would require that the board and committee modify specified rules by January 1, 2014. The bill would apply to an application for a license filed on or after January 1, 2015. 

The bill would amend Chapters 401 and 402 of the Occupations Code, related to the regulation of speech-language pathology and audiology and the fitting and dispensing of hearing instruments. The bill would impact the State Board of Examiners for Speech-Language Pathology and Audiology and the State Committee of Examiners in the Fitting and Dispensing of Health Instruments Committee, both licensing boards that are administratively attached to the Department of State Health Services (DSHS).

DSHS indicates that any rule and administrative modifications necessary to implement the bill would be absorbed within existing resources. The agency further notes that implementation of Section 9 of the bill, which repeals language related to certain licenses, would not impact revenue as the program is not currently exercising the authority that would be repealed.

The bill would take effect September 1, 2013 and would require that the board and committee modify specified rules by January 1, 2014. The bill would apply to an application for a license filed on or after January 1, 2015. 

Local Government Impact

No significant fiscal implication to units of local government is anticipated.

Source Agencies: 537 State Health Services, Department of

537 State Health Services, Department of

LBB Staff: UP, CL, JTe, NB

 UP, CL, JTe, NB