Texas 2013 83rd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB312 Introduced / Bill

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    83R3259 SLB-F
 By: Hegar S.B. No. 312


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the regulation of speech-language pathology and
 audiology.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 401.057, Occupations Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 401.057.  HEARING CONSERVATION PROGRAM. This chapter
 does not prevent a person in an industrial setting from engaging in
 hearing testing as a part of a hearing conservation program in
 compliance with federal Occupational Safety and Health
 Administration regulations [if the person is certified by an agency
 acceptable to the Occupational Safety and Health Administration].
 SECTION 2.  Section 401.304(a), Occupations Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 (a)  To be eligible for licensing as a speech-language
 pathologist or audiologist, an applicant must:
 (1)  if the application is for a license in:
 (A)  speech-language pathology, possess at least
 a master's degree with a major in at least one of the areas of
 communicative sciences or disorders from a program accredited by a
 national accrediting organization that is approved by the board and
 recognized by the United States secretary of education under the
 Higher Education Act of 1965 (20 U.S.C. Section 1001 et seq.) in an
 accredited or approved college or university; or
 (B)  audiology, possess at least a doctoral degree
 in audiology or a related hearing science from a program accredited
 by a national accrediting organization that is approved by the
 board and recognized by the United States secretary of education
 under the Higher Education Act of 1965 (20 U.S.C. Section 1001 et
 seq.) in an accredited or approved college or university;
 (2)  submit a transcript from a public or private
 institution of higher learning showing successful completion of
 course work in amounts set by the board in:
 (A)  normal development and use of speech,
 language, and hearing;
 (B)  evaluation, habilitation, and rehabilitation
 of speech, language, [and] hearing, and swallowing disorders,
 including the use of instruments to measure parameters of
 communication and swallowing; and
 (C)  related fields that augment the work of
 clinical practitioners of speech-language pathology and audiology;
 (3)  have successfully completed at least 36 semester
 hours in courses that are acceptable toward a graduate degree by the
 college or university in which the courses are taken, at least 24 of
 which must be in the professional area for which the license is
 requested [and at least six of which must be:
 [(A)     in audiology if the application is for a
 speech-language pathology license; or
 [(B)     in speech-language pathology if the
 application is for an audiology license];
 (4)  have completed the minimum number of hours,
 established by the board, of supervised clinical experience with
 persons who present a variety of communication disorders; and
 (5)  have completed the full-time supervised
 professional experience, as defined by board rule, in which
 clinical work has been accomplished in the major professional area
 for which the license is being sought.
 SECTION 3.  Section 401.306(a), Occupations Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 (a)  [The board shall notify each examinee of the results of
 the examination not later than the 30th day after the date the
 examination is administered.] If an examination is graded or
 reviewed by a national or state testing service that does not
 directly notify examinees of the examination results, the board
 shall notify each examinee of the results not later than the 14th
 day after the date the board receives the results from the testing
 service.
 SECTION 4.  Subchapter G, Chapter 401, Occupations Code, is
 amended by adding Section 401.315 to read as follows:
 Sec. 401.315.  LICENSING FOR MILITARY SPOUSES.  (a) In this
 section:
 (1)  "Military service member" means a person who is
 currently serving in the armed forces of the United States, in a
 reserve component of the armed forces of the United States,
 including the National Guard, or in the state military service of
 any state.
 (2)  "Military spouse" means a person who is married to
 a military service member.
 (b)  The board shall issue a license to a military spouse
 who:
 (1)  was licensed in good standing as a speech-language
 pathologist or audiologist in another state as of the date of the
 application;
 (2)  holds a master's degree in at least one of the
 areas of communicative sciences or disorders from a program
 accredited by a national accrediting organization that is:
 (A)  approved by the board; and
 (B)  recognized by the United States secretary of
 education under the Higher Education Act of 1965 (20 U.S.C. Section
 1001 et seq.); and
 (3)  has not been the subject of a disciplinary action
 in any jurisdiction in which the applicant is or has been licensed.
 SECTION 5.  Section 401.403(a), Occupations Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 (a)  An audiologist may:
 (1)  engage in any act necessary to:
 (A)  evaluate and provide therapy for hearing and
 balance function;
 (B)  train in the use of amplification, including
 hearing instruments;
 (C)  make earmolds for hearing instruments;
 (D)  fit, dispense, and sell hearing instruments;
 or
 (E)  manage cerumen;
 (2)  participate in consultation regarding noise
 control and hearing conservation;
 (3)  provide evaluations of environment or equipment,
 including calibration of equipment used in testing auditory
 functioning and hearing conservation; and
 (4)  perform basic speech and language screening tests
 and procedures consistent with the audiologist's training.
 SECTION 6.  Subchapter I, Chapter 401, Occupations Code, is
 amended by adding Section 401.405 to read as follows:
 Sec. 401.405.  TELEPRACTICE. (a) In this section,
 "telepractice" means the use of telecommunications technology by a
 license holder for an assessment, intervention, or consultation
 regarding a speech-language pathology or audiology client.
 (b)  The board may adopt rules to provide for the practice of
 speech-language pathology or audiology by the use of telepractice
 by a person licensed under this chapter, including rules that
 establish the qualifications and duties of license holders who use
 telepractice.
 SECTION 7.  The following sections of the Occupations Code
 are repealed:
 (1)  Section 401.309;
 (2)  Section 401.314;
 (3)  Section 401.355(c); and
 (4)  Section 401.401.
 SECTION 8.  The State Board of Examiners for Speech-Language
 Pathology and Audiology by rule may establish a procedure to issue
 an audiologist license to a person who submits an application
 before September 1, 2014, and who:
 (1)  has a master's degree in audiology; and
 (2)  was licensed as an audiologist in this state
 between September 1, 2007, and September 1, 2011.
 SECTION 9.  Section 401.304, Occupations Code, as amended by
 this Act, applies only to an application for a license filed on or
 after January 1, 2015. An application for a license filed before
 January 1, 2015, is governed by the law in effect on the date the
 application was filed, and that law is continued in effect for that
 purpose.
 SECTION 10.  The State Board of Examiners for
 Speech-Language Pathology and Audiology shall adopt any rules
 necessary to implement Section 401.304, Occupations Code, as
 amended by this Act, not later than January 1, 2014.
 SECTION 11.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2013.