Texas 2013 83rd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB321 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Williams S.B. No. 321
 (In the Senate - Filed January 31, 2013; February 5, 2013,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Intergovernmental
 Relations; April 2, 2013, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 5, Nays 0; April 2, 2013, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the powers and duties of the Montgomery County Water
 Control and Improvement District No. 2.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter C, Chapter 9041, Special District
 Local Laws Code, is amended by adding Section 9041.105 to read as
 follows:
 Sec. 9041.105.  POWERS AND DUTIES RELATED TO FILL PROJECTS.
 (a)  The district has the powers and duties provided by the general
 law of this state, including Chapters 49 and 57, Water Code,
 applicable to levee improvement districts created under Section 59,
 Article XVI, Texas Constitution.
 (b)  The district may:
 (1)  reclaim land in the district; and
 (2)  construct works, facilities, and improvements
 necessary to accomplish that purpose.
 (c)  The district may finance and contract for the
 construction of a fill project or for the acquisition of land for a
 fill project in the district, including drainage and reclamation.
 (d)  For the district's exercise of a power of or performance
 of a duty of a levee improvement district as provided by Subsection
 (c), the Texas Commission on Environmental Quality shall consider
 the district to be a levee improvement district.
 SECTION 2.  (a)  The legal notice of the intention to
 introduce this Act, setting forth the general substance of this
 Act, has been published as provided by law, and the notice and a
 copy of this Act have been furnished to all persons, agencies,
 officials, or entities to which they are required to be furnished
 under Section 59, Article XVI, Texas Constitution, and Chapter 313,
 Government Code.
 (b)  The governor, one of the required recipients, has
 submitted the notice and Act to the Texas Commission on
 Environmental Quality.
 (c)  The Texas Commission on Environmental Quality has filed
 its recommendations relating to this Act with the governor, the
 lieutenant governor, and the speaker of the house of
 representatives within the required time.
 (d)  All requirements of the constitution and laws of this
 state and the rules and procedures of the legislature with respect
 to the notice, introduction, and passage of this Act are fulfilled
 and accomplished.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2013.
 * * * * *