Texas 2013 83rd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB336 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Rodriguez S.B. No. 336
 (In the Senate - Filed February 1, 2013; February 5, 2013,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Criminal Justice;
 April 8, 2013, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 7, Nays 0; April 8, 2013,
 sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 336 By:  Whitmire


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the qualifications for appointment as a medical
 examiner.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 2, Article 49.25, Code of Criminal
 Procedure, is amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 2.  APPOINTMENTS AND QUALIFICATIONS.  (a)  The
 commissioners court shall appoint the medical examiner, who serves
 [shall serve] at the pleasure of the commissioners court. A [No]
 person [shall be] appointed as the medical examiner must be:
 (1)  [unless he is] a physician licensed by the Texas
 Medical [State] Board; or
 (2)  a person who:
 (A)  is licensed and in good standing as a
 physician in another state;
 (B)  has applied to the Texas Medical Board for a
 license to practice medicine in this state; and
 (C)  has been granted a provisional license under
 Section 155.101, Occupations Code [of Medical Examiners].
 (b)  To the greatest extent possible, the medical examiner
 shall be appointed from persons having training and experience in
 pathology, toxicology, histology and other medico-legal sciences.
 (c)  The medical examiner shall devote the [so much of his]
 time and energy [as is] necessary to perform [in the performance of]
 the duties conferred by this Article.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2013.
 * * * * *