Texas 2013 83rd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB348 House Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Schwertner, et al. S.B. No. 348
 (Kolkhorst)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to a utilization review process for managed care
 organizations participating in the STAR + PLUS Medicaid managed
 care program.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter A, Chapter 533, Government Code, is
 amended by adding Section 533.00281 to read as follows:
 Sec. 533.00281.  UTILIZATION REVIEW FOR STAR + PLUS MEDICAID
 MANAGED CARE ORGANIZATIONS. (a)  The commission's office of
 contract management shall establish an annual utilization review
 process for managed care organizations participating in the STAR +
 PLUS Medicaid managed care program.  The commission shall determine
 the topics to be examined in the review process, except that the
 review process must include a thorough investigation of each
 managed care organization's procedures for determining whether a
 recipient should be enrolled in the STAR + PLUS home and
 community-based services and supports (HCBS) program, including
 the conduct of functional assessments for that purpose and records
 relating to those assessments.
 (b)  The office of contract management shall use the
 utilization review process to review each fiscal year:
 (1)  every managed care organization participating in
 the STAR + PLUS Medicaid managed care program; or
 (2)  only the managed care organizations that, using a
 risk-based assessment process, the office determines have a higher
 likelihood of inappropriate client placement in the STAR + PLUS
 home and community-based services and supports (HCBS) program.
 (c)  Notwithstanding Subsection (b), during the state fiscal
 biennium ending August 31, 2015, the office of contract management
 shall use the utilization review process to review every managed
 care organization participating in the STAR + PLUS Medicaid managed
 care program. This subsection expires September 1, 2016.
 (d)  In conjunction with the commission's office of contract
 management, the commission shall provide a report to the standing
 committees of the senate and house of representatives with
 jurisdiction over the Medicaid program not later than December 1 of
 each year.  The report must:
 (1)  summarize the results of the utilization reviews
 conducted under this section during the preceding fiscal year;
 (2)  provide analysis of errors committed by each
 reviewed managed care organization; and
 (3)  extrapolate those findings and make
 recommendations for improving the efficiency of the program.
 (e)  If a utilization review conducted under this section
 results in a determination to recoup money from a managed care
 organization, a service provider who contracts with the managed
 care organization may not be held liable for the good faith
 provision of services based on an authorization from the managed
 care organization.
 SECTION 2.  The Health and Human Services Commission shall
 provide the first report required by Subsection (d), Section
 533.00281, Government Code, as added by this Act, not later than
 December 1, 2014.
 SECTION 3.  If before implementing any provision of this Act
 a state agency determines that a waiver or authorization from a
 federal agency is necessary for implementation of that provision,
 the agency affected by the provision shall request the waiver or
 authorization and may delay implementing that provision until the
 waiver or authorization is granted.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2013.